Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Ballots

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0063
Title
Elections - Ballots - Random Ordering of Names
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0280 (SB1061)
Title
Ballot Access - Voter Registration - Affiliating With a Party
Sponsor
Delegate Tarlau
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0542
Title
Election Law - Eligible Detainees - Information on Voting Rights
Sponsor
Delegate Ali
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0662 (SB0256)
Title
Presidential Candidate Tax Transparency Act
Sponsor
Delegate Tarlau
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0767
Title
Election Law - Securing Elections From Foreign Interference
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0768
Title
Election Law - Online Political Advertisements and Campaign Material - Disclosure
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0829 /CH0746 (SB0730/CH0745)
Title
Local Government - Municipal Elections - No-Excuse Absentee Voting
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1278 /CH0523
Title
Election Law - Postelection Tabulation Audit
Sponsor
Delegate Kaiser
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1326
Title
Election Law - Voter Registration and Absentee Voting - Proof of Citizenship
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1331 /CH0524
Title
Election Law - Cybersecurity
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1427
Title
Election Law – Use of Ballot Marking Devices
Sponsor
Delegate Conaway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1563
Title
Election Law - Qualification of Voters - Proof of Identity
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1658 (SB1126)
Title
Election Law – Absentee Ballot Requests, Delivery, and Marking
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0256 (HB0662)
Title
Presidential Candidate Tax Transparency Act
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0333
Title
Election Law - Voting - Ballot Request and Canvassing Procedures
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0547
Title
Election Law - Elections by Mail
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0591
Title
Elections - Absentee Ballot Application - Required Information
Sponsor
Senator Bates
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0592
Title
Joint Committee on Election Oversight - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Bates
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0730 /CH0745 (HB0829/CH0746)
Title
Local Government - Municipal Elections - No-Excuse Absentee Voting
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1061 (HB0280)
Title
Ballot Access - Voter Registration - Affiliating With a Party
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1126 (HB1658)
Title
Election Law - Absentee Ballot Requests, Delivery, and Marking
Sponsor
Senator Kasemeyer
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0063 Elections - Ballots - Random Ordering of Names Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/25/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0280 (SB1061) Ballot Access - Voter Registration - Affiliating With a Party Delegate Tarlau 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0542 Election Law - Eligible Detainees - Information on Voting Rights Delegate Ali 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0662 (SB0256) Presidential Candidate Tax Transparency Act Delegate Tarlau 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0767 Election Law - Securing Elections From Foreign Interference Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0768 Election Law - Online Political Advertisements and Campaign Material - Disclosure Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0829 /CH0746 (SB0730/CH0745) Local Government - Municipal Elections - No-Excuse Absentee Voting Delegate Washington, A. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 746
Ways and Means
2/16/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1278 /CH0523 Election Law - Postelection Tabulation Audit Delegate Kaiser 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 523
Ways and Means
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1326 Election Law - Voter Registration and Absentee Voting - Proof of Citizenship Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Ways and Means
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1331 /CH0524 Election Law - Cybersecurity Delegate Washington, A. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 524
Ways and Means
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1427 Election Law – Use of Ballot Marking Devices Delegate Conaway 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1563 Election Law - Qualification of Voters - Proof of Identity Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Ways and Means
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1658 (SB1126) Election Law – Absentee Ballot Requests, Delivery, and Marking Delegate Washington, A. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0256 (HB0662) Presidential Candidate Tax Transparency Act Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/30/2018 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0333 Election Law - Voting - Ballot Request and Canvassing Procedures Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0547 Election Law - Elections by Mail Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0591 Elections - Absentee Ballot Application - Required Information Senator Bates 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0592 Joint Committee on Election Oversight - Establishment Senator Bates 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0730 /CH0745 (HB0829/CH0746) Local Government - Municipal Elections - No-Excuse Absentee Voting Senator Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 745
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1061 (HB0280) Ballot Access - Voter Registration - Affiliating With a Party Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1126 (HB1658) Election Law - Absentee Ballot Requests, Delivery, and Marking Senator Kasemeyer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:35 PM