Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Bankruptcy

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0446 /CH0599
Title
Tax Sales - Reimbursement for Attorney's Fees
Sponsor
Delegate Stukes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1403 /CH0109
Title
Homestead Exemption - Bankruptcy - Interest in Manufactured Home
Sponsor
Delegate Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1527
Title
Real Property - Bankruptcy Proceedings - Expedited Foreclosure Timeline
Sponsor
Delegate Braveboy
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0446 /CH0599 Tax Sales - Reimbursement for Attorney's Fees Delegate Stukes 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 599
Ways and Means
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/19/2014 - 1:45 PM
HB1403 /CH0109 Homestead Exemption - Bankruptcy - Interest in Manufactured Home Delegate Norman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 109
Judiciary
3/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1527 Real Property - Bankruptcy Proceedings - Expedited Foreclosure Timeline Delegate Braveboy 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:29 PM