Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Bankruptcy

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0172 /CH0035 (SB0144)
Title
Anne Arundel County Board of Education and School Board Nominating Commission
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0508 (SB0330)
Title
Residential Property - Foreclosure Sale - Recordation of Instrument of Writing
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0742
Title
Environment - Water Service Shut Off Protection Act
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0330 (HB0508)
Title
Residential Property - Foreclosure Sale - Recordation of Instrument of Writing
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0172 /CH0035 (SB0144) Anne Arundel County Board of Education and School Board Nominating Commission Anne Arundel County Delegation 4 2 Gubernatorial Veto Override - Chapter 35
Ways and Means
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0508 (SB0330) Residential Property - Foreclosure Sale - Recordation of Instrument of Writing Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the House - Referred to interim study by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0742 Environment - Water Service Shut Off Protection Act Delegate Washington, M. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0330 (HB0508) Residential Property - Foreclosure Sale - Recordation of Instrument of Writing Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:32 PM
Click to return on the top page