Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Banks and Trust Companies

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0458
Title
Personal and Business Documents - Evidence
Sponsor
Delegate Niemann
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0498
Title
Financial Institutions - Automated Teller Machine Check Deposits - Mandatory Review
Sponsor
Delegate Braveboy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0576 (SB0794)
Title
Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers
Sponsor
Delegate Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0814
Title
Commercial Law - Debt Collection - Attachment Fees
Sponsor
Delegate Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0930
Title
Criminal Law - Identity Fraud - Prohibitions
Sponsor
Delegate Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1211 /CH0486 (SB0489/CH0485)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Slayer's Statute (Ann Sue Metz Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Schulz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1306
Title
Public Banking Institutions - Authorization and Task Force
Sponsor
Delegate Gutierrez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0003
Title
Reinstatement of the Separation of Commercial and Investment Banking Functions
Sponsor
Delegate Braveboy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0489 /CH0485 (HB1211/CH0486)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Slayer's Statute (Ann Sue Metz Law)
Sponsor
Senator Shank
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0794 (HB0576)
Title
Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0458 Personal and Business Documents - Evidence Delegate Niemann 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0498 Financial Institutions - Automated Teller Machine Check Deposits - Mandatory Review Delegate Braveboy 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB0576 (SB0794) Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers Delegate Beidle 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Environmental Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0814 Commercial Law - Debt Collection - Attachment Fees Delegate Norman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
2/22/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0930 Criminal Law - Identity Fraud - Prohibitions Delegate Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1211 /CH0486 (SB0489/CH0485) Estates and Trusts - Slayer's Statute (Ann Sue Metz Law) Delegate Schulz 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 486
Judiciary
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1306 Public Banking Institutions - Authorization and Task Force Delegate Gutierrez 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
HJ0003 Reinstatement of the Separation of Commercial and Investment Banking Functions Delegate Braveboy 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 2:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/04/2013 - 2:00 PM
SB0489 /CH0485 (HB1211/CH0486) Estates and Trusts - Slayer's Statute (Ann Sue Metz Law) Senator Shank 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 485
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0794 (HB0576) Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM