Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Banks and Trust Companies

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0135
Title
Annual Reports and Personal Property Reports - Fees, Exemption, and Affidavit
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0188 /CH0478
Title
Financial Institutions - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Disclosure and Sharing of Information
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0326 /CH0482
Title
Housing and Community Development - Business Lending and Neighborhood Revitalization
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0457 (SB0385)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Filing Fees - Reductions
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0794
Title
Public Banking Institutions - Authorization and Task Force
Sponsor
Delegate Gutierrez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1314 (SB0772)
Title
Financial Institutions - Single-Party and Multiple-Party Accounts - Right to Funds on Death of a Party
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1570 (SB1119/CH0469)
Title
State Treasurer - Supranational Issuers
Sponsor
Delegate Gutierrez
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0002 (SJ0006)
Title
Reinstatement of the Separation of Commercial and Investment Banking Functions
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0087 /CH0340
Title
Mortgage Loan Originators - State Criminal History Records Check Requirement - Repeal
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0307 /CH0182
Title
Calvert County - Bonding Authority
Sponsor
Calvert County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0385 (HB0457)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Filing Fees - Reductions
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0397
Title
Civil Actions and Procedures - Garnishments - Spousal Property
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0772 (HB1314)
Title
Financial Institutions - Single-Party and Multiple-Party Accounts - Right to Funds on Death of a Party
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0912 /CH0592 (HB0387/CH0593)
Title
Clean Energy Loan Program - Residential Property - Study
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1111
Title
Correctional Services - Inmate Savings Accounts
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1119 /CH0469 (HB1570)
Title
State Treasurer - Supranational Issuers
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0006 (HJ0002)
Title
Reinstatement of the Separation of Commercial and Investment Banking Functions
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0135 Annual Reports and Personal Property Reports - Fees, Exemption, and Affidavit Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/03/2016 - 2:00 PM
HB0188 /CH0478 Financial Institutions - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Disclosure and Sharing of Information Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 478
Economic Matters
2/03/2016 - 2:00 PM
Finance
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0326 /CH0482 Housing and Community Development - Business Lending and Neighborhood Revitalization Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 482
Environment and Transportation
2/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0457 (SB0385) Corporations and Associations - Filing Fees - Reductions Speaker 3 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0794 Public Banking Institutions - Authorization and Task Force Delegate Gutierrez 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1314 (SB0772) Financial Institutions - Single-Party and Multiple-Party Accounts - Right to Funds on Death of a Party Speaker 6 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB1570 (SB1119/CH0469) State Treasurer - Supranational Issuers Delegate Gutierrez 4 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HJ0002 (SJ0006) Reinstatement of the Separation of Commercial and Investment Banking Functions Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0087 /CH0340 Mortgage Loan Originators - State Criminal History Records Check Requirement - Repeal Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 340
Finance
1/14/2016 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
3/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0307 /CH0182 Calvert County - Bonding Authority Calvert County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 182
Budget and Taxation
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0385 (HB0457) Corporations and Associations - Filing Fees - Reductions President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0397 Civil Actions and Procedures - Garnishments - Spousal Property Senator Norman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0772 (HB1314) Financial Institutions - Single-Party and Multiple-Party Accounts - Right to Funds on Death of a Party President 6 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0912 /CH0592 (HB0387/CH0593) Clean Energy Loan Program - Residential Property - Study Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 592
Finance
3/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB1111 Correctional Services - Inmate Savings Accounts Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1119 /CH0469 (HB1570) State Treasurer - Supranational Issuers Senator Rosapepe 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 469
Budget and Taxation
3/17/2016 - 1:30 PM
Appropriations
4/05/2016 - 1:00 PM
SJ0006 (HJ0002) Reinstatement of the Separation of Commercial and Investment Banking Functions Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:32 PM