Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Banks and Trust Companies

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0143 /CH0107
Title
Elections - Miscellaneous Duties and Procedures
Sponsor
Chair, Ways and Means Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0202 /CH0268 (SB0255/CH0267)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Authority to Arrange Custody of Investments and Procurement Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes, B.
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0591
Title
Task Force to Study the Local Economic Impact of Bank Deserts in Maryland
Sponsor
Delegate Conaway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0718 /CH0266 (SB0206/CH0265)
Title
Financial Institutions - Qualifications of Directors of Commercial Banks - Residency
Sponsor
Delegate Carey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0782 (SB0402)
Title
Insurance - Impaired Entities - Delinquency Proceedings
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1168 /CH0618 (SB0957/CH0619)
Title
Counties and Municipalities - Land Bank Authorities
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1184
Title
Corporations and Associations - Filing Fees - Reductions
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1400 (SB1098)
Title
Commercial Law - Credit Card Processors - Service Agreements
Sponsor
Delegate Howard, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1499
Title
Consumer Protection - Bank Overdraft Plans - Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Gutierrez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0004
Title
Reinstatement of the Separation of Commercial and Investment Banking Functions
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0206 /CH0265 (HB0718/CH0266)
Title
Financial Institutions - Qualifications of Directors of Commercial Banks - Residency
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0255 /CH0267 (HB0202/CH0268)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Authority to Arrange Custody of Investments and Procurement Exemption
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0402 (HB0782)
Title
Insurance - Impaired Entities - Delinquency Proceedings
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0512
Title
Civil Actions and Procedures - Garnishments - Spousal Property
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0957 /CH0619 (HB1168/CH0618)
Title
Counties and Municipalities - Land Bank Authorities
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1098 (HB1400)
Title
Commercial Law - Credit Card Processors - Service Agreements
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0143 /CH0107 Elections - Miscellaneous Duties and Procedures Chair, Ways and Means Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 107
Ways and Means
2/07/2017 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0202 /CH0268 (SB0255/CH0267) State Retirement and Pension System - Authority to Arrange Custody of Investments and Procurement Exemption Delegate Barnes, B. 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 268
Appropriations
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/16/2017 - 8:30 AM
HB0591 Task Force to Study the Local Economic Impact of Bank Deserts in Maryland Delegate Conaway 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0718 /CH0266 (SB0206/CH0265) Financial Institutions - Qualifications of Directors of Commercial Banks - Residency Delegate Carey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 266
Economic Matters
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0782 (SB0402) Insurance - Impaired Entities - Delinquency Proceedings Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1168 /CH0618 (SB0957/CH0619) Counties and Municipalities - Land Bank Authorities Delegate Holmes 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 618
Environment and Transportation
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1184 Corporations and Associations - Filing Fees - Reductions Delegate Malone 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1400 (SB1098) Commercial Law - Credit Card Processors - Service Agreements Delegate Howard, S. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
3/10/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1499 Consumer Protection - Bank Overdraft Plans - Requirements Delegate Gutierrez 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/10/2017 - 1:00 PM
HJ0004 Reinstatement of the Separation of Commercial and Investment Banking Functions Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/03/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0206 /CH0265 (HB0718/CH0266) Financial Institutions - Qualifications of Directors of Commercial Banks - Residency Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 265
Finance
1/31/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0255 /CH0267 (HB0202/CH0268) State Retirement and Pension System - Authority to Arrange Custody of Investments and Procurement Exemption Senator Guzzone 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 267
Budget and Taxation
2/02/2017 - 9:00 AM
Appropriations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0402 (HB0782) Insurance - Impaired Entities - Delinquency Proceedings Senator Middleton 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0512 Civil Actions and Procedures - Garnishments - Spousal Property Senator Norman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0957 /CH0619 (HB1168/CH0618) Counties and Municipalities - Land Bank Authorities Senator Eckardt 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 619
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
SB1098 (HB1400) Commercial Law - Credit Card Processors - Service Agreements Senator Reilly 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:34 PM