Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Banks and Trust Companies

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0061 /CH0092
Title
Financial Institutions - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Mortgage Lenders, Loan Servicers, and Loan Originators
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0222 /CH0349
Title
Real Property - Residential Real Estate Transactions - Escrow Agents
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0469 /CH0273
Title
Supplemental Retirement Plans - Investments - Procurement of Investment Management Services
Sponsor
Chair, Appropriations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0593 (SB0485)
Title
Maryland Collection Agency Licensing Act - Definitions and Legislative Intent
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1127 (SB0786)
Title
Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2019
Sponsor
Delegate Carey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1340
Title
Task Force to Study the Local Economic Impact of Bank Deserts in Maryland
Sponsor
Delegate Conaway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0022 /CH0100
Title
Insurance Regulation - Third Party Administrators - Life Insurance
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0485 (HB0593)
Title
Maryland Collection Agency Licensing Act - Definitions and Legislative Intent
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0786 (HB1127)
Title
Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2019
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0061 /CH0092 Financial Institutions - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Mortgage Lenders, Loan Servicers, and Loan Originators Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 92
Economic Matters
1/30/2019 - 3:00 PM
Finance
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0222 /CH0349 Real Property - Residential Real Estate Transactions - Escrow Agents Delegate Holmes 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 349
Environment and Transportation
2/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/20/2019 - 12:00 PM
HB0469 /CH0273 Supplemental Retirement Plans - Investments - Procurement of Investment Management Services Chair, Appropriations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 273
Appropriations
2/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/14/2019 - 9:00 AM
HB0593 (SB0485) Maryland Collection Agency Licensing Act - Definitions and Legislative Intent Speaker 6 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Economic Matters
2/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB1127 (SB0786) Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2019 Delegate Carey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1340 Task Force to Study the Local Economic Impact of Bank Deserts in Maryland Delegate Conaway 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0022 /CH0100 Insurance Regulation - Third Party Administrators - Life Insurance Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 100
Finance
1/30/2019 - 2:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0485 (HB0593) Maryland Collection Agency Licensing Act - Definitions and Legislative Intent President 6 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
3/12/2019 - 9:00 AM
SB0786 (HB1127) Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2019 Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:18 PM