Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Banks and Trust Companies

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0855
Title
Financial Institutions - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Money Transmissions
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0895
Title
Indigenous Peoples' Day - Rule of Interpretation and Replacement of Columbus Day
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1385
Title
Town of Mount Airy (Carroll County and Frederick County) - Urban Renewal Authority
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1403
Title
Financial Institutions - State Banks - Investing in For-Profit Correctional Facilities - Prohibited
Sponsor
Delegate Mosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1556
Title
Calvert County - Procurement - Contract Renewal
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0014
Title
Financial Institutions - State Banks, Trust Companies, and Savings Banks - Incorporators
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0015
Title
Financial Institutions - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Banking Institution Powers
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0076
Title
Legal Holiday - Maryland Emancipation Day - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0754
Title
Financial Institutions - Consumer Protection - Money Transmissions and Virtual Currencies
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0801
Title
Civil Action - Surety Insurance - Failure to Act in Good Faith
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0855 Financial Institutions - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Money Transmissions Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 In the House - Second Reading Passed
Economic Matters
3/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0895 Indigenous Peoples' Day - Rule of Interpretation and Replacement of Columbus Day Delegate Fisher, W. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1385 Town of Mount Airy (Carroll County and Frederick County) - Urban Renewal Authority Frederick County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1403 Financial Institutions - State Banks - Investing in For-Profit Correctional Facilities - Prohibited Delegate Mosby 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1556 Calvert County - Procurement - Contract Renewal Calvert County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0014 Financial Institutions - State Banks, Trust Companies, and Savings Banks - Incorporators Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Finance
1/22/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/16/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0015 Financial Institutions - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Banking Institution Powers Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Finance
1/22/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/16/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0076 Legal Holiday - Maryland Emancipation Day - Establishment Senator Ellis 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0754 Financial Institutions - Consumer Protection - Money Transmissions and Virtual Currencies Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Finance
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0801 Civil Action - Surety Insurance - Failure to Act in Good Faith Senator Reilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/18/2020 5:52 PM