Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Barbers

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0179 /CH0493 (SB0209)
Title
Frederick County - Beer and Wine Licenses - Barbershops
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0250 /CH0256
Title
State Board of Barbers and State Board of Cosmetologists - Special Fund and Fees
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0501
Title
Business Occupations and Professions - Barber and Cosmetology Professionals - Domestic Violence and Sexual Assault Awareness Education
Sponsor
Delegate Chang
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1261 /CH0198
Title
Barbers - Criminal Penalties for Violations of Barbering Law - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Wilkins
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0209 (HB0179/CH0493)
Title
Frederick County - Beer and Wine Licenses - Barbershops
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1030
Title
State Board of Cosmetologists - Licensing and License Renewal - Domestic Violence and Sexual Assault Awareness Course
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0179 /CH0493 (SB0209) Frederick County - Beer and Wine Licenses - Barbershops Frederick County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 493
Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0250 /CH0256 State Board of Barbers and State Board of Cosmetologists - Special Fund and Fees Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 256
Economic Matters
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0501 Business Occupations and Professions - Barber and Cosmetology Professionals - Domestic Violence and Sexual Assault Awareness Education Delegate Chang 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1261 /CH0198 Barbers - Criminal Penalties for Violations of Barbering Law - Repeal Delegate Wilkins 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 198
Economic Matters
3/06/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0209 (HB0179/CH0493) Frederick County - Beer and Wine Licenses - Barbershops Senator Young 2 2 Veto sustained (0-44)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB1030 State Board of Cosmetologists - Licensing and License Renewal - Domestic Violence and Sexual Assault Awareness Course Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:34 PM