Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Bees

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0132 /CH0614
Title
State Government - Pollinator Habitat Plans
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0211 /CH0662 (SB0198/CH0661)
Title
Neonicotinoid Pesticides - Restrictions on Sales and Use (Pollinator Protection Act of 2016)
Sponsor
Delegate Healey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1102
Title
Vehicle Laws - Special Registration Plates - Celebrating Maryland Native Plants and Pollinators
Sponsor
Delegate Afzali
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0113 /CH0022
Title
Department of Agriculture - Bees, Bee Colonies, and Used Bee Equipment - Transportation and Shipment
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0198 /CH0661 (HB0211/CH0662)
Title
Neonicotinoid Pesticides - Restrictions on Sales and Use (Pollinator Protection Act of 2016)
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0132 /CH0614 State Government - Pollinator Habitat Plans Delegate Lafferty 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 614
Environment and Transportation
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0211 /CH0662 (SB0198/CH0661) Neonicotinoid Pesticides - Restrictions on Sales and Use (Pollinator Protection Act of 2016) Delegate Healey 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 662
Environment and Transportation
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1102 Vehicle Laws - Special Registration Plates - Celebrating Maryland Native Plants and Pollinators Delegate Afzali 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0113 /CH0022 Department of Agriculture - Bees, Bee Colonies, and Used Bee Equipment - Transportation and Shipment Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 22
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/26/2016 - 2:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0198 /CH0661 (HB0211/CH0662) Neonicotinoid Pesticides - Restrictions on Sales and Use (Pollinator Protection Act of 2016) Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 661
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:32 PM