Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Beneficiaries -see also- Estates and Trusts

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0492 /CH0684
Title
Vehicle Laws - Certificate of Title - Transfer-on-Death Beneficiary Designation
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0722 (SB0881)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0735 /CH0626 (SB0073/CH0627)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Share of Intestate Estate Inherited by Surviving Spouse
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0753 /CH0354 (SB0793/CH0355)
Title
Maryland Trust Act - Representatives of Beneficiaries
Sponsor
Delegate West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0754 /CH0356 (SB0792/CH0357)
Title
Maryland Trust Act - Notice and Reporting Requirements - Exemptions
Sponsor
Delegate West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1064 (SB0478)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Guaranteed Retirement Income Plan and Retirement Savings Plan
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1122 /CH0278 (SB0913/CH0277)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Death Benefits
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes, B.
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1292
Title
State Board of Dental Examiners - Ownership, Management, or Operation of a Dental Practice
Sponsor
Delegate West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1360 (SB0449/CH0663)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Vehicle Transfers - Excise Tax and Fee Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0073 /CH0627 (HB0735/CH0626)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Share of Intestate Estate Inherited by Surviving Spouse
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0144
Title
Civil Actions - Prelitigation Discovery of Insurance Coverage
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0449 /CH0663 (HB1360)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Vehicle Transfers - Excise Tax and Fee Exemption
Sponsor
Senator Kasemeyer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0478 (HB1064)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Guaranteed Retirement Income Plan and Retirement Savings Plan
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0792 /CH0357 (HB0754/CH0356)
Title
Maryland Trust Act - Notice and Reporting Requirements - Exemptions
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0793 /CH0355 (HB0753/CH0354)
Title
Maryland Trust Act - Representatives of Beneficiaries
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0881 (HB0722)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0913 /CH0277 (HB1122/CH0278)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Death Benefits
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1100
Title
Intestate Estates - Inheritance by Surviving Parent - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0492 /CH0684 Vehicle Laws - Certificate of Title - Transfer-on-Death Beneficiary Designation Delegate Carr 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 684
Environment and Transportation
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0722 (SB0881) Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0735 /CH0626 (SB0073/CH0627) Estates and Trusts - Share of Intestate Estate Inherited by Surviving Spouse Delegate Malone 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 626
Health and Government Operations
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0753 /CH0354 (SB0793/CH0355) Maryland Trust Act - Representatives of Beneficiaries Delegate West 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 354
Health and Government Operations
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0754 /CH0356 (SB0792/CH0357) Maryland Trust Act - Notice and Reporting Requirements - Exemptions Delegate West 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 356
Health and Government Operations
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1064 (SB0478) State Retirement and Pension System - Guaranteed Retirement Income Plan and Retirement Savings Plan Delegate Krebs 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1122 /CH0278 (SB0913/CH0277) State Retirement and Pension System - Death Benefits Delegate Barnes, B. 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 278
Appropriations
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 9:00 AM
HB1292 State Board of Dental Examiners - Ownership, Management, or Operation of a Dental Practice Delegate West 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 12:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/13/2017 - 12:00 PM
HB1360 (SB0449/CH0663) Estates and Trusts - Vehicle Transfers - Excise Tax and Fee Exemption Delegate Hixson 2 2 Veto sustained (0-140)
Health and Government Operations
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0073 /CH0627 (HB0735/CH0626) Estates and Trusts - Share of Intestate Estate Inherited by Surviving Spouse Senator Reilly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 627
Judicial Proceedings
2/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0144 Civil Actions - Prelitigation Discovery of Insurance Coverage Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
1/26/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0449 /CH0663 (HB1360) Estates and Trusts - Vehicle Transfers - Excise Tax and Fee Exemption Senator Kasemeyer 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 663
Budget and Taxation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0478 (HB1064) State Retirement and Pension System - Guaranteed Retirement Income Plan and Retirement Savings Plan Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/16 at 9:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/16/2017 - 9:00 AM
SB0792 /CH0357 (HB0754/CH0356) Maryland Trust Act - Notice and Reporting Requirements - Exemptions Senator Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 357
Judicial Proceedings
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0793 /CH0355 (HB0753/CH0354) Maryland Trust Act - Representatives of Beneficiaries Senator Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 355
Judicial Proceedings
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0881 (HB0722) Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0913 /CH0277 (HB1122/CH0278) State Retirement and Pension System - Death Benefits Senator Guzzone 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 277
Budget and Taxation
3/02/2017 - 8:30 AM
Appropriations
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1100 Intestate Estates - Inheritance by Surviving Parent - Repeal Senator Brochin 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:34 PM