Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Beneficiaries -see also- Estates and Trusts

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0027 /CH0430 (SB0168/CH0431)
Title
Life Insurance - Life of a Minor - Underwriting Standards and Procedures
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0474 /CH0260 (SB1014/CH0261)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Breach of Trust Action - Limitation Period
Sponsor
Delegate West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0627 /CH0113
Title
Calvert County - Length of Service Award Program - Death Benefits
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0777 (SB0649)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0782 /CH0390 (SB0550/CH0391)
Title
Maryland Achieving a Better Life Experience (ABLE) Program – Modifications
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0783 (SB0109)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Share of Intestate Estate Inherited by Surviving Parent - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0948 /CH0316
Title
Estates and Trusts – Transfer From Revocable Trust – Exemption From Taxes and Fees
Sponsor
Delegate Morgan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1349 /CH0451 (SB1079)
Title
Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Anderton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1402
Title
Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Pharmacy Choice
Sponsor
Delegate Adams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1608
Title
Real Property - Trust Money - Escrow Trust Accounts
Sponsor
Delegate Morgan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0109 (HB0783)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Share of Intestate Estate Inherited by Surviving Parent - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0112 /CH0061
Title
Natural Resources - Tidal Fish Licenses
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0168 /CH0431 (HB0027/CH0430)
Title
Life Insurance - Life of a Minor - Underwriting Standards and Procedures
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0372 /CH0315
Title
Estates and Trusts – Transfer From Revocable Trust – Exemption From Taxes and Fees
Sponsor
Senator Kasemeyer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0550 /CH0391 (HB0782/CH0390)
Title
Maryland Achieving a Better Life Experience (ABLE) Program – Modifications
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0649 (HB0777)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1014 /CH0261 (HB0474/CH0260)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Breach of Trust Action - Limitation Period
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1079 (HB1349/CH0451)
Title
Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0027 /CH0430 (SB0168/CH0431) Life Insurance - Life of a Minor - Underwriting Standards and Procedures Delegate Barron 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 430
Health and Government Operations
1/31/2018 - 2:00 PM
Finance
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0474 /CH0260 (SB1014/CH0261) Estates and Trusts - Breach of Trust Action - Limitation Period Delegate West 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 260
Health and Government Operations
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0627 /CH0113 Calvert County - Length of Service Award Program - Death Benefits Calvert County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 113
Environment and Transportation
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0777 (SB0649) Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0782 /CH0390 (SB0550/CH0391) Maryland Achieving a Better Life Experience (ABLE) Program – Modifications Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 390
Health and Government Operations
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0783 (SB0109) Estates and Trusts - Share of Intestate Estate Inherited by Surviving Parent - Repeal Delegate Malone 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0948 /CH0316 Estates and Trusts – Transfer From Revocable Trust – Exemption From Taxes and Fees Delegate Morgan 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 316
Health and Government Operations
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1349 /CH0451 (SB1079) Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Revisions Delegate Anderton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 451
Health and Government Operations
3/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1402 Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Pharmacy Choice Delegate Adams 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
HB1608 Real Property - Trust Money - Escrow Trust Accounts Delegate Morgan 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0109 (HB0783) Estates and Trusts - Share of Intestate Estate Inherited by Surviving Parent - Repeal Senator Reilly 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/11/2018 - 1:15 PM
SB0112 /CH0061 Natural Resources - Tidal Fish Licenses Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 61
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/16/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0168 /CH0431 (HB0027/CH0430) Life Insurance - Life of a Minor - Underwriting Standards and Procedures Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 431
Finance
2/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0372 /CH0315 Estates and Trusts – Transfer From Revocable Trust – Exemption From Taxes and Fees Senator Kasemeyer 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 315
Budget and Taxation
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0550 /CH0391 (HB0782/CH0390) Maryland Achieving a Better Life Experience (ABLE) Program – Modifications Senator Zucker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 391
Budget and Taxation
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0649 (HB0777) Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse Senator Kelley 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1014 /CH0261 (HB0474/CH0260) Estates and Trusts - Breach of Trust Action - Limitation Period Senator Ready 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 261
Judicial Proceedings
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1079 (HB1349/CH0451) Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Revisions Senator Mathias 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Finance
3/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:35 PM