Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Beverage Containers

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0179 /CH0493 (SB0209)
Title
Frederick County - Beer and Wine Licenses - Barbershops
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0289 /CH0778 (SB0479/CH0602)
Title
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Marketplace License
Sponsor
Delegate Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0292 /CH0317 (SB0491/CH0318)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Nonrefillable Containers - Draft Beer
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0296
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Warehouse Shopping Clubs - Beer or Wine Licenses
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0380 (SB0937)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Civil Offenses - Public Consumption and Possession of Open Container
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0397 /CH0306
Title
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses MC 17-17
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0409
Title
Baltimore County - Freedom in Brewing Act
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1283 /CH0813
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Class 5 Brewery License
Sponsor
Delegate Branch
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0209 (HB0179/CH0493)
Title
Frederick County - Beer and Wine Licenses - Barbershops
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0275
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Wine Village Permit
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0479 /CH0602 (HB0289/CH0778)
Title
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Marketplace License
Sponsor
Senator Robinson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0491 /CH0318 (HB0292/CH0317)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Nonrefillable Containers - Draft Beer
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0937 (HB0380)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Civil Offenses - Public Consumption and Possession of Open Container
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0179 /CH0493 (SB0209) Frederick County - Beer and Wine Licenses - Barbershops Frederick County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 493
Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0289 /CH0778 (SB0479/CH0602) Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Marketplace License Delegate Hayes 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 778
Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0292 /CH0317 (SB0491/CH0318) Alcoholic Beverages - Nonrefillable Containers - Draft Beer Delegate Krebs 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 317
Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0296 Alcoholic Beverages - Warehouse Shopping Clubs - Beer or Wine Licenses Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0380 (SB0937) Alcoholic Beverages - Civil Offenses - Public Consumption and Possession of Open Container Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
HB0397 /CH0306 Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses MC 17-17 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 306
Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0409 Baltimore County - Freedom in Brewing Act Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB1283 /CH0813 Alcoholic Beverages - Class 5 Brewery License Delegate Branch 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 813
Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0209 (HB0179/CH0493) Frederick County - Beer and Wine Licenses - Barbershops Senator Young 2 2 Veto sustained (0-44)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0275 Alcoholic Beverages - Wine Village Permit Senator Reilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0479 /CH0602 (HB0289/CH0778) Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Marketplace License Senator Robinson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 602
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0491 /CH0318 (HB0292/CH0317) Alcoholic Beverages - Nonrefillable Containers - Draft Beer Senator Ready 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 318
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0937 (HB0380) Alcoholic Beverages - Civil Offenses - Public Consumption and Possession of Open Container Senator Smith 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Judiciary
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:34 PM