Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Beverage Containers

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0109 /CH0579 (SB0285/CH0580)
Title
Environment – Expanded Polystyrene Food Service Products – Prohibitions
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0869 /CH0701
Title
Howard County – Alcoholic Beverages – Marketplace License Ho. Co. 06–19
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1010 /CH0317 (SB0801/CH0318)
Title
Brewery Modernization Act of 2019
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0801 /CH0318 (HB1010/CH0317)
Title
Brewery Modernization Act of 2019
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0109 /CH0579 (SB0285/CH0580) Environment – Expanded Polystyrene Food Service Products – Prohibitions Delegate Lierman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 579
Environment and Transportation
2/06/2019 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0869 /CH0701 Howard County – Alcoholic Beverages – Marketplace License Ho. Co. 06–19 Howard County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 701
Economic Matters
2/18/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1010 /CH0317 (SB0801/CH0318) Brewery Modernization Act of 2019 Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 317
Economic Matters
2/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0801 /CH0318 (HB1010/CH0317) Brewery Modernization Act of 2019 Senator Hayes 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 318
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:18 PM