Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Bicycles

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0052 (SB0808)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Bicycles and Motor Scooters - Rules of the Road
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0092
Title
Vehicle Laws - Passing a Bicycle, an Electric Personal Assistive Mobility Device, or a Motor Scooter - Distance Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0205
Title
Vehicle Laws - Electric Bicycle - Definition
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0241
Title
Vehicle Laws - Overtaking and Passing Bicycles, Personal Mobility Devices, or Motor Scooters
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0250 /CH0392
Title
Vehicle Laws - Definition of "Bicycle" - Mopeds
Sponsor
Delegate McMillan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0530 (SB0520/CH0514)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Bicycles and Motor Scooters - Operation on Roadways
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0378 /CH0294
Title
Vehicle Laws - Electric Bicycle - Definition
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0520 /CH0514 (HB0530)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Bicycles and Motor Scooters - Operation on Roadways
Sponsor
Senator Robey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0808 (HB0052)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Bicycles and Motor Scooters - Rules of the Road
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0052 (SB0808) Vehicle Laws - Bicycles and Motor Scooters - Rules of the Road Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
1/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0092 Vehicle Laws - Passing a Bicycle, an Electric Personal Assistive Mobility Device, or a Motor Scooter - Distance Requirement Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
1/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0205 Vehicle Laws - Electric Bicycle - Definition Delegate Kelly, K. 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Environmental Matters
1/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0241 Vehicle Laws - Overtaking and Passing Bicycles, Personal Mobility Devices, or Motor Scooters Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0250 /CH0392 Vehicle Laws - Definition of "Bicycle" - Mopeds Delegate McMillan 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 392
Environmental Matters
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0530 (SB0520/CH0514) Vehicle Laws - Bicycles and Motor Scooters - Operation on Roadways Delegate Malone 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Environmental Matters
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0378 /CH0294 Vehicle Laws - Electric Bicycle - Definition Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 294
Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0520 /CH0514 (HB0530) Vehicle Laws - Bicycles and Motor Scooters - Operation on Roadways Senator Robey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 514
Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0808 (HB0052) Vehicle Laws - Bicycles and Motor Scooters - Rules of the Road Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:29 PM