Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Bicycles

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0214 (SB1123)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Passing Bicycles, Personal Mobility Devices, or Motor Scooters
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0426
Title
Vehicle Laws - Bicycles and Motor Scooters - Use of Bike Lanes
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1013 /CH0036 (SB0908)
Title
Maryland Open Transportation Investment Decision Act of 2016
Sponsor
Delegate Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1043
Title
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road - Lane Changes
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0908 (HB1013/CH0036)
Title
Maryland Open Transportation Investment Decision Act of 2016
Sponsor
Senator DeGrange
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1123 (HB0214)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Passing Bicycles, Personal Mobility Devices, or Motor Scooters
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0214 (SB1123) Vehicle Laws - Passing Bicycles, Personal Mobility Devices, or Motor Scooters Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
2/11/2016 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0426 Vehicle Laws - Bicycles and Motor Scooters - Use of Bike Lanes Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1013 /CH0036 (SB0908) Maryland Open Transportation Investment Decision Act of 2016 Delegate Beidle 2 2 Gubernatorial Veto Override - Chapter 36
Appropriations
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1043 Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road - Lane Changes Delegate Malone 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0908 (HB1013/CH0036) Maryland Open Transportation Investment Decision Act of 2016 Senator DeGrange 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/14/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1123 (HB0214) Vehicle Laws - Passing Bicycles, Personal Mobility Devices, or Motor Scooters Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:32 PM