Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Bicycles

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0067 (SB0843)
Title
I-495 and I-270 Public-Private Partnership - Partnership Agreement - Requirements (Maryland Department of Transportation Promises Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0284
Title
Vehicle Laws – Dedicated Bus Lanes – Enforcement
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0487
Title
Education – School Construction – Pedestrian Safety Plans (School Pedestrian Safety Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Solomon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0595 (SB0726)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Personal Delivery Devices - Standards and Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0097
Title
Purple Line Marketing Act
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0726 (HB0595)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Personal Delivery Devices - Standards and Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0843 (HB0067)
Title
I-495 and I-270 Public-Private Partnership - Partnership Agreement - Requirements (Maryland Department of Transportation Promises Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0067 (SB0843) I-495 and I-270 Public-Private Partnership - Partnership Agreement - Requirements (Maryland Department of Transportation Promises Act of 2021) Delegate Korman 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Budget and Taxation and Finance
Environment and Transportation
2/12/2021 - 1:30 PM
Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
Finance
HB0284 Vehicle Laws – Dedicated Bus Lanes – Enforcement Delegate Lewis, R. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/01/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0487 Education – School Construction – Pedestrian Safety Plans (School Pedestrian Safety Act) Delegate Solomon 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
1/27/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/24/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0595 (SB0726) Vehicle Laws - Personal Delivery Devices - Standards and Requirements Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
2/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0097 Purple Line Marketing Act Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Finance
1/27/2021 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/30/2021 - 1:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0726 (HB0595) Vehicle Laws - Personal Delivery Devices - Standards and Requirements Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2021 - 12:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0843 (HB0067) I-495 and I-270 Public-Private Partnership - Partnership Agreement - Requirements (Maryland Department of Transportation Promises Act of 2021) Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 12:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Budget and Taxation
2/24/2021 - 12:00 PM
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/12/2021 9:10 PM
Click to return on the top page