Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Bingo

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0069 (SB0841)
Title
Calvert County - Personal Property Tax - Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0322
Title
Harford County - Charitable Gaming
Sponsor
Harford County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0333
Title
Electronic Bingo and Electronic Tip Jars - Distribution of Admissions and Amusement Tax Revenues
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0265 /CH0334
Title
Calvert County - Electronic Bingo and Electronic Tip Jars - Distribution of Admissions and Amusement Tax Revenues
Sponsor
Calvert County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0443 /CH0173
Title
Harford County - Charitable Gaming
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0841 (HB0069)
Title
Calvert County - Personal Property Tax - Exemption
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0069 (SB0841) Calvert County - Personal Property Tax - Exemption Delegate Fisher 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0322 Harford County - Charitable Gaming Harford County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Ways and Means
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB0333 Electronic Bingo and Electronic Tip Jars - Distribution of Admissions and Amusement Tax Revenues Delegate Fisher 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0265 /CH0334 Calvert County - Electronic Bingo and Electronic Tip Jars - Distribution of Admissions and Amusement Tax Revenues Calvert County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 334
Budget and Taxation
Ways and Means
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0443 /CH0173 Harford County - Charitable Gaming Senator Norman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 173
Budget and Taxation
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0841 (HB0069) Calvert County - Personal Property Tax - Exemption Senator Waugh 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM