Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Bingo

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0143
Title
Carroll County and Montgomery County – Gaming – Bingo Games MC 13–18
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0868 (SB0992)
Title
Senior Citizen Activities Centers - Bingo Games - Authorization
Sponsor
Delegate Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0918
Title
Calvert County - Personal Property Tax - Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1459 /CH0118
Title
Calvert County – Youth Recreational Opportunities Fund and Distribution From Admissions and Amusement Tax Revenues
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1484
Title
Calvert County - Class NB Instant Bingo License
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0961 /CH0420
Title
Calvert County - Youth Recreational Opportunities Fund and Distribution From Admissions and Amusement Tax Revenues
Sponsor
Calvert County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0992 (HB0868)
Title
Senior Citizen Activities Centers - Bingo Games - Authorization
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0143 Carroll County and Montgomery County – Gaming – Bingo Games MC 13–18 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/31/2018 - 2:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0868 (SB0992) Senior Citizen Activities Centers - Bingo Games - Authorization Delegate Reilly 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/16/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0918 Calvert County - Personal Property Tax - Exemption Delegate Fisher 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1459 /CH0118 Calvert County – Youth Recreational Opportunities Fund and Distribution From Admissions and Amusement Tax Revenues Calvert County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 118
Environment and Transportation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1484 Calvert County - Class NB Instant Bingo License Calvert County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/02/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0961 /CH0420 Calvert County - Youth Recreational Opportunities Fund and Distribution From Admissions and Amusement Tax Revenues Calvert County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 420
Budget and Taxation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0992 (HB0868) Senior Citizen Activities Centers - Bingo Games - Authorization Senator Jennings 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:36 PM
Click to return on the top page