Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Biometrics

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0741 /CH0533 (SB0601/CH0532)
Title
Business and Economic Development - Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative Program
Sponsor
Delegate Bohanan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0847 (SB0926)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Government Drone Use - Limitations
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0851
Title
Health Insurance - Biometric Health Care Identification Cards
Sponsor
Delegate George
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1120 (SB0387)
Title
Drivers' Licenses, Identification Cards, and Moped Operators' Permits - Enhanced Identification Documents
Sponsor
Delegate George
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0387 (HB1120)
Title
Drivers' Licenses, Identification Cards, and Moped Operators' Permits - Enhanced Identification Documents
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0601 /CH0532 (HB0741/CH0533)
Title
Business and Economic Development - Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative Program
Sponsor
Senator Miller
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0926 (HB0847)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Government Drone Use - Limitations
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0741 /CH0533 (SB0601/CH0532) Business and Economic Development - Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative Program Delegate Bohanan 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 533
Ways and Means
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
HB0847 (SB0926) Criminal Procedure - Government Drone Use - Limitations Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0851 Health Insurance - Biometric Health Care Identification Cards Delegate George 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Health and Government Operations
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1120 (SB0387) Drivers' Licenses, Identification Cards, and Moped Operators' Permits - Enhanced Identification Documents Delegate George 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0387 (HB1120) Drivers' Licenses, Identification Cards, and Moped Operators' Permits - Enhanced Identification Documents Senator Reilly 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0601 /CH0532 (HB0741/CH0533) Business and Economic Development - Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative Program Senator Miller 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 532
Budget and Taxation
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0926 (HB0847) Criminal Procedure - Government Drone Use - Limitations Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:29 PM