Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Biometrics

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0648 /CH0374 (SB0652)
Title
Interstate Physical Therapy Licensure Compact
Sponsor
Delegate Bagnall
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0716
Title
State Government - Protection of Information - Revisions (Maryland Data Privacy Act)
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0652 (HB0648/CH0374)
Title
Interstate Physical Therapy Licensure Compact
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0648 /CH0374 (SB0652) Interstate Physical Therapy Licensure Compact Delegate Bagnall 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 374
Health and Government Operations
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0716 State Government - Protection of Information - Revisions (Maryland Data Privacy Act) Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 In the House - House Requests Senate Recede
Health and Government Operations
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/02/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0652 (HB0648/CH0374) Interstate Physical Therapy Licensure Compact Senator Young 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:18 PM