Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Biometrics

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0307
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Biometric Identifiers and Biometric Information Privacy
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0784 (SB0957)
Title
Consumer Protection - Online Privacy - Study
Sponsor
Delegate Carey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1656
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Privacy and Data Collection
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0046
Title
State's Attorney - Required Disclosure - Facial Recognition and DNA Analysis and Search
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0957 (HB0784)
Title
Maryland Online Consumer Protection Act
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0307 Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Biometric Identifiers and Biometric Information Privacy Delegate Love 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0784 (SB0957) Consumer Protection - Online Privacy - Study Delegate Carey 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Economic Matters
3/09/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1656 Commercial Law - Consumer Privacy and Data Collection Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0046 State's Attorney - Required Disclosure - Facial Recognition and DNA Analysis and Search Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
1/15/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0957 (HB0784) Maryland Online Consumer Protection Act Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/17/2020 12:16 PM