Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Birds

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0093
Title
Criminal Law - Animal Cruelty - Payment of Costs
Sponsor
Delegate Murphy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0196 (SB0192)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Turkey Hunting - Fall Season
Sponsor
Delegate Costa
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0406 (SB0472/CH0506)
Title
Allegany County, Garrett County, and Washington County - Sunday Hunting
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0149
Title
Criminal Law - Animal Cruelty - Payment of Costs
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0192 (HB0196)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Turkey Hunting - Fall Season
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0472 /CH0506 (HB0406)
Title
Allegany County, Garrett County, and Washington County - Sunday Hunting
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0093 Criminal Law - Animal Cruelty - Payment of Costs Delegate Murphy 2 2 In the House - House Requests Senate Recede
Judiciary
1/23/2014 - 2:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0196 (SB0192) Anne Arundel County - Turkey Hunting - Fall Season Delegate Costa 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
1/29/2014 - 2:00 PM
HB0406 (SB0472/CH0506) Allegany County, Garrett County, and Washington County - Sunday Hunting Delegate Beitzel 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Environmental Matters
3/07/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0149 Criminal Law - Animal Cruelty - Payment of Costs Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/29/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0192 (HB0196) Anne Arundel County - Turkey Hunting - Fall Season Senator Reilly 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0472 /CH0506 (HB0406) Allegany County, Garrett County, and Washington County - Sunday Hunting Senator Edwards 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 506
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/02/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:29 PM