Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Birds

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0018 (SB0378)
Title
Baltimore County - Sunday Hunting
Sponsor
Delegate Cluster
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0170 (SB0088/CH0148)
Title
Natural Resources - Game Birds - Baiting
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0285 (SB0117)
Title
Caroline County and Dorchester County - Sunday Hunting
Sponsor
Caroline County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0713
Title
Natural Resources - Trade in Ivory and Rhinoceros Horn - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0005 (SJ0005)
Title
Natural Resources - Goose and Duck Hunting Seasons - Extension
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0088 /CH0148 (HB0170)
Title
Natural Resources - Game Birds - Baiting
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0117 (HB0285)
Title
Caroline County and Dorchester County - Sunday Hunting
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0378 (HB0018)
Title
Baltimore County - Sunday Hunting
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0005 (HJ0005)
Title
Natural Resources - Goose and Duck Hunting Seasons - Extension
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0018 (SB0378) Baltimore County - Sunday Hunting Delegate Cluster 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB0170 (SB0088/CH0148) Natural Resources - Game Birds - Baiting Delegate Beitzel 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Environment and Transportation
2/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0285 (SB0117) Caroline County and Dorchester County - Sunday Hunting Caroline County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0713 Natural Resources - Trade in Ivory and Rhinoceros Horn - Prohibition Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/04/2015 - 1:15 PM
HJ0005 (SJ0005) Natural Resources - Goose and Duck Hunting Seasons - Extension Delegate Mautz 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/09/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0088 /CH0148 (HB0170) Natural Resources - Game Birds - Baiting Senator Astle 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 148
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0117 (HB0285) Caroline County and Dorchester County - Sunday Hunting Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0378 (HB0018) Baltimore County - Sunday Hunting Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
SJ0005 (HJ0005) Natural Resources - Goose and Duck Hunting Seasons - Extension Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/30 at 3:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/30/2015 - 3:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM