Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Birds

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0132 /CH0614
Title
State Government - Pollinator Habitat Plans
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0169 (SB0219/CH0180)
Title
Carroll County - Turkey Hunting on Private Property - Sundays
Sponsor
Carroll County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0203
Title
Caroline County - Sunday Hunting
Sponsor
Caroline County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0321 /CH0334 (SB0046/CH0333)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Archery Hunting - Safety Zone
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0516 /CH0269
Title
Harford County - Archery Hunting - Safety Zone
Sponsor
Delegate Glass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0542 (SB0991)
Title
Natural Resources - Wildlife Trafficking Prevention
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0599 (SB0496)
Title
Poultry Litter Management Act
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0829 (SB0607)
Title
Agriculture - Cattle, Swine, and Poultry - Use of Antimicrobial Drugs
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1037
Title
State Designations - State Waterfowl - Canvasback Duck
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1163
Title
Agriculture - Veterinary Feed Directives - Information Collection
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1223
Title
Natural Resources - Apprentice Hunting License - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate O'Donnell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1506
Title
Natural Resources - Wildlife and Hunting
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1612 (SB1042)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Wicomico County - Ward Museum of Wildfowl Art
Sponsor
Wicomico County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0027
Title
State Designations - State Duck - Canvasback
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0046 /CH0333 (HB0321/CH0334)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Archery Hunting - Safety Zone
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0219 /CH0180 (HB0169)
Title
Carroll County - Turkey Hunting on Private Property - Sundays
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0496 (HB0599)
Title
Poultry Litter Management Act
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0607 (HB0829)
Title
Agriculture - Cattle, Swine, and Poultry - Use of Antimicrobial Drugs
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0991 (HB0542)
Title
Natural Resources - Wildlife Trafficking Prevention
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1042 (HB1612)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Wicomico County - Ward Museum of Wildfowl Art
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0132 /CH0614 State Government - Pollinator Habitat Plans Delegate Lafferty 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 614
Environment and Transportation
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0169 (SB0219/CH0180) Carroll County - Turkey Hunting on Private Property - Sundays Carroll County Delegation 4 2 Veto sustained (0-135)
Environment and Transportation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0203 Caroline County - Sunday Hunting Caroline County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0321 /CH0334 (SB0046/CH0333) Anne Arundel County - Archery Hunting - Safety Zone Anne Arundel County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 334
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0516 /CH0269 Harford County - Archery Hunting - Safety Zone Delegate Glass 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 269
Environment and Transportation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/05/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0542 (SB0991) Natural Resources - Wildlife Trafficking Prevention Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0599 (SB0496) Poultry Litter Management Act Delegate Lam 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0829 (SB0607) Agriculture - Cattle, Swine, and Poultry - Use of Antimicrobial Drugs Delegate Robinson, S. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1037 State Designations - State Waterfowl - Canvasback Duck Delegate Lisanti 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1163 Agriculture - Veterinary Feed Directives - Information Collection Delegate Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1223 Natural Resources - Apprentice Hunting License - Establishment Delegate O'Donnell 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1506 Natural Resources - Wildlife and Hunting Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Environment and Transportation
4/07/2016 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB1612 (SB1042) Creation of a State Debt - Wicomico County - Ward Museum of Wildfowl Art Wicomico County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/14/2016 - 9:00 AM
SB0027 State Designations - State Duck - Canvasback Senator Cassilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0046 /CH0333 (HB0321/CH0334) Anne Arundel County - Archery Hunting - Safety Zone Senator Reilly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 333
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0219 /CH0180 (HB0169) Carroll County - Turkey Hunting on Private Property - Sundays Senator Ready 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 180
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0496 (HB0599) Poultry Litter Management Act Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0607 (HB0829) Agriculture - Cattle, Swine, and Poultry - Use of Antimicrobial Drugs Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0991 (HB0542) Natural Resources - Wildlife Trafficking Prevention Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB1042 (HB1612) Creation of a State Debt - Wicomico County - Ward Museum of Wildfowl Art Senator Mathias 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 10:30 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/14/2016 - 10:30 AM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:32 PM