Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Birth Control -see also- Reproductive Matters

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0613 /CH0820 (SB0363/CH0821)
Title
Pharmacists - Contraceptives - Prescribing and Dispensing
Sponsor
Delegate Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1159 (SB0814)
Title
Pharmacists - Dispensing of Prescription Drugs - Single Dispensing of Dosage Units
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1205
Title
Public Institutions of Higher Education - Access of Students to Emergency Contraception
Sponsor
Delegate Morales
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0052 (HB1245)
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - Disposable Medical Supplies and Condoms
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0363 /CH0821 (HB0613/CH0820)
Title
Pharmacists - Contraceptives - Prescribing and Dispensing
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0814 (HB1159)
Title
Pharmacists - Dispensing of Prescription Drugs - Single Dispensing of Dosage Units
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0613 /CH0820 (SB0363/CH0821) Pharmacists - Contraceptives - Prescribing and Dispensing Delegate Hettleman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 820
Health and Government Operations
2/10/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1159 (SB0814) Pharmacists - Dispensing of Prescription Drugs - Single Dispensing of Dosage Units Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1205 Public Institutions of Higher Education - Access of Students to Emergency Contraception Delegate Morales 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0052 (HB1245) Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - Disposable Medical Supplies and Condoms Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/18 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/18/2017 - 2:00 PM
SB0363 /CH0821 (HB0613/CH0820) Pharmacists - Contraceptives - Prescribing and Dispensing Senator Conway 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 821
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0814 (HB1159) Pharmacists - Dispensing of Prescription Drugs - Single Dispensing of Dosage Units Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:35 PM