Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Birth Control -see also- Reproductive Matters

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0975 (SB0907)
Title
Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection Act
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1272 /CH0733 (SB0904/CH0734)
Title
Maryland Department of Health - Family Planning Program - Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Pendergrass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0904 /CH0734 (HB1272/CH0733)
Title
Maryland Department of Health - Family Planning Program - Funding
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0907 (HB0975)
Title
Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection Act
Sponsor
Senator Serafini
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0975 (SB0907) Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection Act Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/08/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1272 /CH0733 (SB0904/CH0734) Maryland Department of Health - Family Planning Program - Funding Delegate Pendergrass 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 733
Health and Government Operations
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0904 /CH0734 (HB1272/CH0733) Maryland Department of Health - Family Planning Program - Funding Senator Kelley 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 734
Finance
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0907 (HB0975) Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection Act Senator Serafini 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:18 PM