Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Blind Persons

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0021 (SB0119)
Title
Property Tax - Exemption for Blind Individuals and Surviving Spouses
Sponsor
Delegate Vitale
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0516
Title
Office of Legislative Audits - Fiscal/Compliance Audits - Blind Industries and Services of Maryland
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0550 (SB0365)
Title
Income Tax Credit - Web Site Modifications - Accessibility for the Blind
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1023
Title
Public Ethics - Blind Industries and Services of Maryland
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1176 /CH0471 (SB0461/CH0470)
Title
Primary and Secondary Education - Online Courses and Services - Accessibility
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1372 /CH0430 (SB0934)
Title
Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Jones
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0119 (HB0021)
Title
Property Tax - Exemption for Blind Individuals and Surviving Spouses
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0365 (HB0550)
Title
Income Tax Credit - Web Site Modifications - Accessibility for the Blind
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0461 /CH0470 (HB1176/CH0471)
Title
Primary and Secondary Education - Online Courses and Services - Accessibility
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0934 (HB1372/CH0430)
Title
Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - Alterations
Sponsor
Senator DeGrange
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0021 (SB0119) Property Tax - Exemption for Blind Individuals and Surviving Spouses Delegate Vitale 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/16 at 11:00 a.m.
Ways and Means
1/16/2013 - 11:00 AM
HB0516 Office of Legislative Audits - Fiscal/Compliance Audits - Blind Industries and Services of Maryland Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
HB0550 (SB0365) Income Tax Credit - Web Site Modifications - Accessibility for the Blind Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1023 Public Ethics - Blind Industries and Services of Maryland Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1176 /CH0471 (SB0461/CH0470) Primary and Secondary Education - Online Courses and Services - Accessibility Delegate Hixson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 471
Ways and Means
3/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1372 /CH0430 (SB0934) Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - Alterations Delegate Jones 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 430
Appropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0119 (HB0021) Property Tax - Exemption for Blind Individuals and Surviving Spouses Senator Reilly 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0365 (HB0550) Income Tax Credit - Web Site Modifications - Accessibility for the Blind Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0461 /CH0470 (HB1176/CH0471) Primary and Secondary Education - Online Courses and Services - Accessibility Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 470
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0934 (HB1372/CH0430) Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - Alterations Senator DeGrange 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/15/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM