Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Blind Persons

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0396 /CH0503 (SB0446/CH0502)
Title
Department of Disabilities - Study of Accessibility Concepts in Computer Science, Information Systems, and Information Technology Programs in Higher Education
Sponsor
Delegate Turner
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0486 (SB0189)
Title
Property Tax - Exemption for Blind Individuals and Surviving Spouses
Sponsor
Delegate George
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0519 (SB0528)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Lions Camp Merrick
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1009 (SB0789)
Title
Civil Actions - Noneconomic Damages - Catastrophic Injury
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1242 (SB0419/CH0498)
Title
Libraries - Maryland Library for the Blind and Physically Handicapped - Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1300
Title
Special Education - Visually Impaired Students - Orientation and Mobility Evaluation
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0020
Title
Office of the Deaf and Hard of Hearing - Name Change
Sponsor
Senator Forehand
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0189 (HB0486)
Title
Property Tax - Exemption for Blind Individuals and Surviving Spouses
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0419 /CH0498 (HB1242)
Title
Libraries - Maryland Library for the Blind and Physically Handicapped - Funding
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0446 /CH0502 (HB0396/CH0503)
Title
Department of Disabilities - Study of Accessibility Concepts in Computer Science, Information Systems, and Information Technology Programs in Higher Education
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0528 (HB0519)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Lions Camp Merrick
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0789 (HB1009)
Title
Civil Actions - Noneconomic Damages - Catastrophic Injury
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0396 /CH0503 (SB0446/CH0502) Department of Disabilities - Study of Accessibility Concepts in Computer Science, Information Systems, and Information Technology Programs in Higher Education Delegate Turner 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 503
Appropriations
2/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0486 (SB0189) Property Tax - Exemption for Blind Individuals and Surviving Spouses Delegate George 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0519 (SB0528) Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Lions Camp Merrick Charles County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/08/2014 - 3:00 PM
HB1009 (SB0789) Civil Actions - Noneconomic Damages - Catastrophic Injury Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1242 (SB0419/CH0498) Libraries - Maryland Library for the Blind and Physically Handicapped - Funding Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed
Ways and Means
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1300 Special Education - Visually Impaired Students - Orientation and Mobility Evaluation Delegate Washington, A. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0020 Office of the Deaf and Hard of Hearing - Name Change Senator Forehand 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Finance
1/15/2014 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0189 (HB0486) Property Tax - Exemption for Blind Individuals and Surviving Spouses Senator Reilly 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/29/2014 - 1:45 PM
Ways and Means
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0419 /CH0498 (HB1242) Libraries - Maryland Library for the Blind and Physically Handicapped - Funding Senator Manno 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 498
Budget and Taxation
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0446 /CH0502 (HB0396/CH0503) Department of Disabilities - Study of Accessibility Concepts in Computer Science, Information Systems, and Information Technology Programs in Higher Education Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 502
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0528 (HB0519) Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Lions Camp Merrick Senator Middleton 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 4:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2014 - 4:00 PM
SB0789 (HB1009) Civil Actions - Noneconomic Damages - Catastrophic Injury Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:29 PM