Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Blind Persons

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0172 (SB0778)
Title
Task Force to Study Issues Related to the Use of Self-Driving Vehicles
Sponsor
Delegate Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0349 /CH0415 (SB0894)
Title
Procurement Preferences - Pricing and Selection Committees
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0398
Title
Civil Actions - Noneconomic Damages - Catastrophic Injury
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0535 /CH0430 (SB0538)
Title
Blind or Visually Impaired Children - Individualized Education Programs - Orientation and Mobility Instruction
Sponsor
Delegate Turner
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0226
Title
Anne Arundel County - Property Tax Credit - Blind Individuals and Surviving Spouses
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0479
Title
Civil Actions - Noneconomic Damages - Catastrophic Injury
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0538 (HB0535/CH0430)
Title
Blind or Visually Impaired Children - Individualized Education Programs - Orientation and Mobility Instruction
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0894 (HB0349/CH0415)
Title
Procurement Preferences - Pricing and Selection Committees
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0172 (SB0778) Task Force to Study Issues Related to the Use of Self-Driving Vehicles Delegate Beidle 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0349 /CH0415 (SB0894) Procurement Preferences - Pricing and Selection Committees Delegate Robinson, B. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 415
Health and Government Operations
3/16/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0398 Civil Actions - Noneconomic Damages - Catastrophic Injury Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0535 /CH0430 (SB0538) Blind or Visually Impaired Children - Individualized Education Programs - Orientation and Mobility Instruction Delegate Turner 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 430
Ways and Means
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0226 Anne Arundel County - Property Tax Credit - Blind Individuals and Surviving Spouses Senator Reilly 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0479 Civil Actions - Noneconomic Damages - Catastrophic Injury Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0538 (HB0535/CH0430) Blind or Visually Impaired Children - Individualized Education Programs - Orientation and Mobility Instruction Senator Conway 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0894 (HB0349/CH0415) Procurement Preferences - Pricing and Selection Committees Senator Pugh 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM