Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Blind Persons

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0366 /CH0102 (SB0048)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Property Tax Credit - Blind Individuals
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0709 /CH0672 (SB0422/CH0671)
Title
Education - Maryland School for the Blind - Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Jones
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0742
Title
Environment - Water Service Shut Off Protection Act
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0869 (SB0574)
Title
Civil Actions - Noneconomic Damages - Catastrophic Injury
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0976
Title
CINA, Guardianship, Adoption, Custody, and Visitation - Disability of Parent, Guardian, Custodian, or Party
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1375
Title
Public Schools and Libraries - Access to Obscene Materials and Child Pornography - Prohibited
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0048 (HB0366/CH0102)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Property Tax Credit - Blind Individuals
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0422 /CH0671 (HB0709/CH0672)
Title
Education - Maryland School for the Blind - Funding
Sponsor
Senator Kasemeyer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0574 (HB0869)
Title
Civil Actions - Noneconomic Damages - Catastrophic Injury
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0704
Title
CINA Guardianship, Adoption, Custody, and Visitation - Blindness of Parent, Guardian, Custodian, or Party
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0765 /CH0423
Title
CINA, Guardianship, Adoption, Custody, and Visitation - Disability of Parent, Guardian, Custodian, or Party
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0880
Title
Task Force to Study Welfare Reform in Maryland
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0366 /CH0102 (SB0048) Anne Arundel County - Property Tax Credit - Blind Individuals Anne Arundel County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 102
Ways and Means
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0709 /CH0672 (SB0422/CH0671) Education - Maryland School for the Blind - Funding Delegate Jones 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 672
Ways and Means
3/07/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0742 Environment - Water Service Shut Off Protection Act Delegate Washington, M. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0869 (SB0574) Civil Actions - Noneconomic Damages - Catastrophic Injury Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0976 CINA, Guardianship, Adoption, Custody, and Visitation - Disability of Parent, Guardian, Custodian, or Party Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Judiciary
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB1375 Public Schools and Libraries - Access to Obscene Materials and Child Pornography - Prohibited Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0048 (HB0366/CH0102) Anne Arundel County - Property Tax Credit - Blind Individuals Anne Arundel County Senators 4 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Budget and Taxation
1/27/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0422 /CH0671 (HB0709/CH0672) Education - Maryland School for the Blind - Funding Senator Kasemeyer 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 671
Budget and Taxation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0574 (HB0869) Civil Actions - Noneconomic Damages - Catastrophic Injury Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0704 CINA Guardianship, Adoption, Custody, and Visitation - Blindness of Parent, Guardian, Custodian, or Party Senator Gladden 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0765 /CH0423 CINA, Guardianship, Adoption, Custody, and Visitation - Disability of Parent, Guardian, Custodian, or Party Senator Raskin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 423
Judicial Proceedings
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/07/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0880 Task Force to Study Welfare Reform in Maryland Senator Jennings 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:32 PM