Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Blind Persons

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0438 (SB0253)
Title
Legislative Transparency Act of 2017
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0458 (SB0604)
Title
Visual Impairments - Requirements for Teacher Training, Student Screening, and Maryland Medical Assistance Program Coverage
Sponsor
Delegate Kittleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0846 /CH0342
Title
Pricing and Selection Committee for Blind Industries and Services of Maryland and the Employment Works Program - Staff
Sponsor
Delegate Bromwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0859
Title
Business Regulation - Trader's and Chain Stores Licenses and Personal Property Tax - Fees and Exemptions
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1140 (SB0439)
Title
State Procurement - Information Technology - Nonvisual Access
Sponsor
Delegate Platt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1446 /CH0635 (SB1144)
Title
Procurement Preferences - Blind Industries and Services of Maryland - Janitorial Products
Sponsor
Delegate Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0225
Title
Civil Actions - Noneconomic Damages - Catastrophic Injury
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0253 (HB0438)
Title
Legislative Transparency Act of 2017
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0439 (HB1140)
Title
State Procurement - Information Technology - Nonvisual Access
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0604 (HB0458)
Title
Visual Impairments - Requirements for School Personnel Training, Student Screening, and Maryland Medical Assistance Program Coverage
Sponsor
Senator Bates
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1092
Title
Public Assistance Fraud Prevention Act
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1144 (HB1446/CH0635)
Title
Procurement Preferences - Blind Industries and Services of Maryland - Janitorial Products
Sponsor
Senator Robinson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0438 (SB0253) Legislative Transparency Act of 2017 Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
HB0458 (SB0604) Visual Impairments - Requirements for Teacher Training, Student Screening, and Maryland Medical Assistance Program Coverage Delegate Kittleman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB0846 /CH0342 Pricing and Selection Committee for Blind Industries and Services of Maryland and the Employment Works Program - Staff Delegate Bromwell 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 342
Health and Government Operations
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0859 Business Regulation - Trader's and Chain Stores Licenses and Personal Property Tax - Fees and Exemptions Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1140 (SB0439) State Procurement - Information Technology - Nonvisual Access Delegate Platt 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1446 /CH0635 (SB1144) Procurement Preferences - Blind Industries and Services of Maryland - Janitorial Products Delegate Hayes 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 635
Health and Government Operations
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0225 Civil Actions - Noneconomic Damages - Catastrophic Injury Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0253 (HB0438) Legislative Transparency Act of 2017 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0439 (HB1140) State Procurement - Information Technology - Nonvisual Access Senator Conway 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0604 (HB0458) Visual Impairments - Requirements for School Personnel Training, Student Screening, and Maryland Medical Assistance Program Coverage Senator Bates 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (139-0)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
Ways and Means
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB1092 Public Assistance Fraud Prevention Act Senator Jennings 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1144 (HB1446/CH0635) Procurement Preferences - Blind Industries and Services of Maryland - Janitorial Products Senator Robinson 2 2 Veto sustained (0-44)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:35 PM