Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Blind Persons

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0034 /CH0569 (SB0331/CH0570)
Title
Business Regulation - Trader's Licenses - License Fees
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0145 /CH0285 (SB0301/CH0286)
Title
Hospitals - Patient's Bill of Rights
Sponsor
Delegate Young, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0580 (SB0412)
Title
Income Tax - Personal Exemption - Disabled Individuals
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1087 (SB0871)
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1242 (SB0915)
Title
Public School Students – Vision Services – Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1243 (SB0805)
Title
Motor and Electric Scooter Sharing Companies – Nonvisual Access
Sponsor
Delegate Attar
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0301 /CH0286 (HB0145/CH0285)
Title
Hospitals - Patient's Bill of Rights
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0331 /CH0570 (HB0034/CH0569)
Title
Business Regulation - Trader's Licenses - License Fees
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0412 (HB0580)
Title
Income Tax - Personal Exemption - Disabled Individuals
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0678 /CH0407
Title
State Government - Notarial Acts and Notaries Public
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0805 (HB1243)
Title
Motor and Electric Scooter Sharing Companies - Nonvisual Access - Workgroup
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0871 (HB1087)
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0915 (HB1242)
Title
Public School Students - Vision Services and the Vision for Maryland Program
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0034 /CH0569 (SB0331/CH0570) Business Regulation - Trader's Licenses - License Fees Delegate Carr 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 569
Economic Matters
1/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0145 /CH0285 (SB0301/CH0286) Hospitals - Patient's Bill of Rights Delegate Young, K. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 285
Health and Government Operations
2/06/2019 - 2:00 PM
Finance
HB0580 (SB0412) Income Tax - Personal Exemption - Disabled Individuals Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1087 (SB0871) Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Delegate Barron 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1242 (SB0915) Public School Students – Vision Services – Reporting Delegate Hill 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1243 (SB0805) Motor and Electric Scooter Sharing Companies – Nonvisual Access Delegate Attar 2 2 In the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Environment and Transportation
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0301 /CH0286 (HB0145/CH0285) Hospitals - Patient's Bill of Rights Senator Benson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 286
Finance
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/03/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0331 /CH0570 (HB0034/CH0569) Business Regulation - Trader's Licenses - License Fees Senator Kramer 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 570
Finance
2/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0412 (HB0580) Income Tax - Personal Exemption - Disabled Individuals Senator Peters 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0678 /CH0407 State Government - Notarial Acts and Notaries Public Senator Jennings 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 407
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2019 - 12:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/02/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0805 (HB1243) Motor and Electric Scooter Sharing Companies - Nonvisual Access - Workgroup Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Finance
3/08/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0871 (HB1087) Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0915 (HB1242) Public School Students - Vision Services and the Vision for Maryland Program Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:18 PM