Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Blue Laws

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0066 /CH0433 (SB0002/CH0432)
Title
Dorchester County - Turkey Hunting on Public Land - Sundays
Sponsor
Dorchester County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0069 /CH0007 (SB0006/CH0006)
Title
Dorchester County - Restriction on Sunday Gaming - Repeal
Sponsor
Dorchester County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0214 /CH0357
Title
Queen Anne's County - Deer Hunting on Private Property - Sundays
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0272 (SB0041)
Title
Kent County - Deer Hunting on Private Property - Sundays
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0273 (SB0089)
Title
Kent County - Turkey Hunting on Private Property - Sundays
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0275 /CH0461 (SB0349/CH0460)
Title
Wicomico County Liquor Act of 2013
Sponsor
Wicomico County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0464 /CH0245 (SB0371/CH0244)
Title
Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Sales
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0543 /CH0618
Title
Carroll County - Deer Hunting - Sundays
Sponsor
Carroll County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0612 (SB0787)
Title
Queen Anne's County - Turkey Hunting on Private Property - Sundays
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0749 /CH0387 (SB0767)
Title
Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses, Permits, and Other Authorizations
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1078
Title
Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Off-Sale Permit PG 302-13
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1366
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Class CS Chain Store Licenses
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1448 /CH0338
Title
Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Sales
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0002 /CH0432 (HB0066/CH0433)
Title
Dorchester County - Turkey Hunting on Public Land - Sundays
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0006 /CH0006 (HB0069/CH0007)
Title
Dorchester County - Restriction on Sunday Gaming - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0024
Title
Queen Anne's County - Deer Hunting on Private Property - Sundays
Sponsor
Senator Pipkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0041 (HB0272)
Title
Kent County - Deer Hunting on Private Property - Sundays
Sponsor
Senator Pipkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0089 (HB0273)
Title
Kent County - Turkey Hunting on Private Property - Sundays
Sponsor
Senator Pipkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0349 /CH0460 (HB0275/CH0461)
Title
Wicomico County Liquor Act of 2013
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0371 /CH0244 (HB0464/CH0245)
Title
Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Sales
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0767 (HB0749/CH0387)
Title
Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses, Permits, and Other Authorizations
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0787 (HB0612)
Title
Queen Anne's County - Turkey Hunting on Private Property - Sundays
Sponsor
Senator Pipkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1004 /CH0337
Title
Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Sales
Sponsor
Calvert County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0066 /CH0433 (SB0002/CH0432) Dorchester County - Turkey Hunting on Public Land - Sundays Dorchester County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 433
Environmental Matters
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0069 /CH0007 (SB0006/CH0006) Dorchester County - Restriction on Sunday Gaming - Repeal Dorchester County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 7
Ways and Means
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2013 - 1:15 PM
HB0214 /CH0357 Queen Anne's County - Deer Hunting on Private Property - Sundays Senator Hershey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 357
Environmental Matters
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0272 (SB0041) Kent County - Deer Hunting on Private Property - Sundays Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
HB0273 (SB0089) Kent County - Turkey Hunting on Private Property - Sundays Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
HB0275 /CH0461 (SB0349/CH0460) Wicomico County Liquor Act of 2013 Wicomico County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 461
Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0464 /CH0245 (SB0371/CH0244) Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Sales Delegate Beitzel 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 245
Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0543 /CH0618 Carroll County - Deer Hunting - Sundays Carroll County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 618
Environmental Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0612 (SB0787) Queen Anne's County - Turkey Hunting on Private Property - Sundays Senator Hershey 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0749 /CH0387 (SB0767) Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses, Permits, and Other Authorizations Delegate Beitzel 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 387
Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1078 Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Off-Sale Permit PG 302-13 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1366 Alcoholic Beverages - Class CS Chain Store Licenses Delegate Barnes 2 2 In the House - Rereferred to Economic Matters
Economic Matters
HB1448 /CH0338 Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Sales Calvert County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 338
Economic Matters
3/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0002 /CH0432 (HB0066/CH0433) Dorchester County - Turkey Hunting on Public Land - Sundays Senator Colburn 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 432
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/23/2013 - 2:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0006 /CH0006 (HB0069/CH0007) Dorchester County - Restriction on Sunday Gaming - Repeal Senator Colburn 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 6
Budget and Taxation
1/30/2013 - 3:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0024 Queen Anne's County - Deer Hunting on Private Property - Sundays Senator Pipkin 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/23/2013 - 2:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/03/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0041 (HB0272) Kent County - Deer Hunting on Private Property - Sundays Senator Pipkin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/23/2013 - 2:00 PM
SB0089 (HB0273) Kent County - Turkey Hunting on Private Property - Sundays Senator Pipkin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/23/2013 - 2:00 PM
SB0349 /CH0460 (HB0275/CH0461) Wicomico County Liquor Act of 2013 Senator Colburn 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 460
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0371 /CH0244 (HB0464/CH0245) Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Sales Senator Edwards 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 244
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0767 (HB0749/CH0387) Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses, Permits, and Other Authorizations Senator Edwards 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/01/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0787 (HB0612) Queen Anne's County - Turkey Hunting on Private Property - Sundays Senator Pipkin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB1004 /CH0337 Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Sales Calvert County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 337
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/08/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM