Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Blue Laws

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0167 /CH0123 (SB0060/CH0122)
Title
Dorchester County - Class B Beer and Light Wine Licenses - Sunday Sales
Sponsor
Dorchester County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0197 (SB0191)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Deer Hunting - Sundays
Sponsor
Delegate Costa
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0344 /CH0395 (SB0344)
Title
Charles County - Sunday Car Sales Blue Law Exemption - Enabling Authority
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0356 /CH0596
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Class 8 Farm Breweries - Festival Licenses
Sponsor
Delegate Barkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0406 (SB0472/CH0506)
Title
Allegany County, Garrett County, and Washington County - Sunday Hunting
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0432 (SB0473/CH0507)
Title
Frederick County - Deer Hunting - Sundays
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0463 (SB0657/CH0324)
Title
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beer, Wine and Liquor Licenses MC 16-14
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0671
Title
Sunday Hunting - Deer Bow Hunting Season
Sponsor
Delegate Glass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0672
Title
Harford County - Sunday Hunting - Deer Bow Hunting Season
Sponsor
Delegate Glass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0690 /CH0418
Title
Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Sales for Off-Premises Consumption
Sponsor
Garrett County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0759
Title
Calvert County - Deer Hunting - Sundays
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0890
Title
Natural Resources - Deer Hunting - Sundays
Sponsor
Delegate O'Donnell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0966
Title
Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Off-Sale Permit PG 304-14
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1097 /CH0445
Title
Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Sales for On-Premises Consumption
Sponsor
Garrett County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0060 /CH0122 (HB0167/CH0123)
Title
Dorchester County - Class B Beer and Light Wine Licenses - Sunday Sales
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0191 (HB0197)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Deer Hunting - Sundays
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0344 (HB0344/CH0395)
Title
Charles County - Sunday Car Sales Blue Law Exemption - Enabling Authority
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0472 /CH0506 (HB0406)
Title
Allegany County, Garrett County, and Washington County - Sunday Hunting
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0473 /CH0507 (HB0432)
Title
Frederick County - Deer Hunting - Sundays
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0657 /CH0324 (HB0463)
Title
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beer, Wine and Liquor Licenses
Sponsor
Montgomery County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0966 /CH0574
Title
Charles County and St. Mary's County - Deer Hunting
Sponsor
Senator Dyson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0167 /CH0123 (SB0060/CH0122) Dorchester County - Class B Beer and Light Wine Licenses - Sunday Sales Dorchester County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 123
Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0197 (SB0191) Anne Arundel County - Deer Hunting - Sundays Delegate Costa 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/29 at 2:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
1/29/2014 - 2:00 PM
HB0344 /CH0395 (SB0344) Charles County - Sunday Car Sales Blue Law Exemption - Enabling Authority Charles County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 395
Economic Matters
3/07/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0356 /CH0596 Alcoholic Beverages - Class 8 Farm Breweries - Festival Licenses Delegate Barkley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 596
Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0406 (SB0472/CH0506) Allegany County, Garrett County, and Washington County - Sunday Hunting Delegate Beitzel 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Environmental Matters
3/07/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0432 (SB0473/CH0507) Frederick County - Deer Hunting - Sundays Delegate Beitzel 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Environmental Matters
3/07/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0463 (SB0657/CH0324) Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beer, Wine and Liquor Licenses MC 16-14 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0671 Sunday Hunting - Deer Bow Hunting Season Delegate Glass 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 2:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
2/12/2014 - 2:00 PM
HB0672 Harford County - Sunday Hunting - Deer Bow Hunting Season Delegate Glass 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
3/07/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0690 /CH0418 Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Sales for Off-Premises Consumption Garrett County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 418
Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0759 Calvert County - Deer Hunting - Sundays Calvert County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/07/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0890 Natural Resources - Deer Hunting - Sundays Delegate O'Donnell 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0966 Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Off-Sale Permit PG 304-14 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1097 /CH0445 Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Sales for On-Premises Consumption Garrett County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 445
Economic Matters
3/03/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0060 /CH0122 (HB0167/CH0123) Dorchester County - Class B Beer and Light Wine Licenses - Sunday Sales Senator Colburn 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 122
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/23/2014 - 2:45 PM
Economic Matters
SB0191 (HB0197) Anne Arundel County - Deer Hunting - Sundays Senator Reilly 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0344 (HB0344/CH0395) Charles County - Sunday Car Sales Blue Law Exemption - Enabling Authority Senator Middleton 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judicial Proceedings
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0472 /CH0506 (HB0406) Allegany County, Garrett County, and Washington County - Sunday Hunting Senator Edwards 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 506
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/02/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0473 /CH0507 (HB0432) Frederick County - Deer Hunting - Sundays Senator Edwards 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 507
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/02/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0657 /CH0324 (HB0463) Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beer, Wine and Liquor Licenses Montgomery County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 324
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0966 /CH0574 Charles County and St. Mary's County - Deer Hunting Senator Dyson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 574
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/02/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:29 PM