Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Blue Laws

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0018 (SB0378)
Title
Baltimore County - Sunday Hunting
Sponsor
Delegate Cluster
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0117 /CH0222 (SB0719)
Title
Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages - Hours of Sale on Sundays for Holders of Class A Licenses
Sponsor
Carroll County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0139 /CH0071
Title
Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Sales
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0245 /CH0081 (SB0501)
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Permit - Hours of Sale
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0285 (SB0117)
Title
Caroline County and Dorchester County - Sunday Hunting
Sponsor
Caroline County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0411
Title
Deer Bow Hunting Season - Private Property - Additional Sunday in January
Sponsor
Delegate Glass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0414
Title
Sunday Hunting - Deer Bow Hunting Season
Sponsor
Delegate Glass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0655
Title
Harford County - Sunday Hunting - Deer Bow Hunting Season
Sponsor
Delegate Glass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0931 /CH0111
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Prince George's County - Seven Day Sales PG 318-15
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0068 /CH0147
Title
Charles County and St. Mary's County - Deer Management Permit
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0117 (HB0285)
Title
Caroline County and Dorchester County - Sunday Hunting
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0378 (HB0018)
Title
Baltimore County - Sunday Hunting
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0501 (HB0245/CH0081)
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Permit - Hours of Sale
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0719 (HB0117/CH0222)
Title
Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages - Hours of Sale on Sundays for Holders of Class A Licenses
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0866
Title
Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses, Salaries, Inspectors, and Bottle Clubs
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0018 (SB0378) Baltimore County - Sunday Hunting Delegate Cluster 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB0117 /CH0222 (SB0719) Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages - Hours of Sale on Sundays for Holders of Class A Licenses Carroll County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 222
Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0139 /CH0071 Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Sales Delegate Beitzel 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 71
Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0245 /CH0081 (SB0501) Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Permit - Hours of Sale Frederick County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 81
Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0285 (SB0117) Caroline County and Dorchester County - Sunday Hunting Caroline County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0411 Deer Bow Hunting Season - Private Property - Additional Sunday in January Delegate Glass 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0414 Sunday Hunting - Deer Bow Hunting Season Delegate Glass 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0655 Harford County - Sunday Hunting - Deer Bow Hunting Season Delegate Glass 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0931 /CH0111 Alcoholic Beverages - Prince George's County - Seven Day Sales PG 318-15 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 111
Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0068 /CH0147 Charles County and St. Mary's County - Deer Management Permit Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 147
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/03/2015 - 2:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0117 (HB0285) Caroline County and Dorchester County - Sunday Hunting Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0378 (HB0018) Baltimore County - Sunday Hunting Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0501 (HB0245/CH0081) Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Permit - Hours of Sale Senator Young 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0719 (HB0117/CH0222) Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages - Hours of Sale on Sundays for Holders of Class A Licenses Senator Ready 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0866 Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses, Salaries, Inspectors, and Bottle Clubs Senator Peters 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-1)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM