Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Blue Laws

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0022 /CH0754 (SB0809/CH0755)
Title
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Hours of Sale - References to Park Heights Redevelopment Area
Sponsor
Delegate Gibson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0044
Title
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Hours of Sale
Sponsor
Delegate Ali
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0177 /CH0124
Title
Montgomery County – Alcoholic Beverages – Inspections, Food Sales Requirements, and Hours and Days of Sale MC 5–18
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0178 /CH0125
Title
Montgomery County Alcohol Modernization Act of 2018 MC 4-18
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0206 (SB0518)
Title
Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class BLX License - Movie Theaters PG 303-18
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0506 /CH0094 (SB0220/CH0093)
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Arena License
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0518
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Reform on Tap Act of 2018
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0610 /CH0266 (SB0275/CH0267)
Title
Carroll County - Gaming - Repeal of Sunday Prohibition
Sponsor
Carroll County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0745 (SB0519/CH0537)
Title
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Class A-7 License
Sponsor
Baltimore City Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0975
Title
Baltimore County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Sales
Sponsor
Delegate Szeliga
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1001 /CH0136
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Sales at a Bar or Counter
Sponsor
Harford County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1484
Title
Calvert County - Class NB Instant Bingo License
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1586 /CH0088 (SB0355/CH0087)
Title
Wicomico County - Motorcycles - Sunday Sales
Sponsor
Delegate Anderton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0220 /CH0093 (HB0506/CH0094)
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Arena License
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0243 (HB0470)
Title
Baltimore City – Park Heights Redevelopment Area – Alcoholic Beverages
Sponsor
Senator Robinson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0275 /CH0267 (HB0610/CH0266)
Title
Carroll County - Gaming - Repeal of Sunday Prohibition
Sponsor
Carroll County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0355 /CH0087 (HB1586/CH0088)
Title
Wicomico County - Motorcycles - Sunday Sales
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0518 (HB0206)
Title
Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Family Entertainment Permit and Class BLX License for Movie Theaters
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0519 /CH0537 (HB0745)
Title
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Class A-7 License
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0609
Title
Class 5 Breweries - Hours of Sale for On-Premises Consumption
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0809 /CH0755 (HB0022/CH0754)
Title
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Hours of Sale - References to Park Heights Redevelopment Area
Sponsor
Senator Robinson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0022 /CH0754 (SB0809/CH0755) Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Hours of Sale - References to Park Heights Redevelopment Area Delegate Gibson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 754
Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0044 Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Hours of Sale Delegate Ali 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0177 /CH0124 Montgomery County – Alcoholic Beverages – Inspections, Food Sales Requirements, and Hours and Days of Sale MC 5–18 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 124
Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0178 /CH0125 Montgomery County Alcohol Modernization Act of 2018 MC 4-18 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 125
Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0206 (SB0518) Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class BLX License - Movie Theaters PG 303-18 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0506 /CH0094 (SB0220/CH0093) Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Arena License Frederick County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 94
Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0518 Alcoholic Beverages - Reform on Tap Act of 2018 Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0610 /CH0266 (SB0275/CH0267) Carroll County - Gaming - Repeal of Sunday Prohibition Carroll County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 266
Ways and Means
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0745 (SB0519/CH0537) Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Class A-7 License Baltimore City Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0975 Baltimore County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Sales Delegate Szeliga 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1001 /CH0136 Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Sales at a Bar or Counter Harford County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 136
Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1484 Calvert County - Class NB Instant Bingo License Calvert County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/02/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1586 /CH0088 (SB0355/CH0087) Wicomico County - Motorcycles - Sunday Sales Delegate Anderton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 88
Economic Matters
3/12/2018 - 2:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0220 /CH0093 (HB0506/CH0094) Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Arena License Senator Young 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 93
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0243 (HB0470) Baltimore City – Park Heights Redevelopment Area – Alcoholic Beverages Senator Robinson 2 2 In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0275 /CH0267 (HB0610/CH0266) Carroll County - Gaming - Repeal of Sunday Prohibition Carroll County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 267
Budget and Taxation
2/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0355 /CH0087 (HB1586/CH0088) Wicomico County - Motorcycles - Sunday Sales Senator Mathias 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 87
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0518 (HB0206) Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Family Entertainment Permit and Class BLX License for Movie Theaters Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0519 /CH0537 (HB0745) Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Class A-7 License Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 537
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0609 Class 5 Breweries - Hours of Sale for On-Premises Consumption Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0809 /CH0755 (HB0022/CH0754) Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Hours of Sale - References to Park Heights Redevelopment Area Senator Robinson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 755
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:36 PM