Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Boats and Ships

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0412 (SB0451)
Title
Vessel Excise Tax - Exemption for Commercial Enterprises Paying the Admissions and Amusement Tax
Sponsor
Delegate George
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0514
Title
Recreational Hunting or Fishing License Applications - Disclosure of Information
Sponsor
Delegate O'Donnell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0548 (SB0090/CH0180)
Title
Natural Resources - Vessel Excise Tax - Maximum Tax
Sponsor
Delegate George
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0660 (SB0827)
Title
Streamlined Tax Administration Act of 2013
Sponsor
Delegate Davis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0954 (SB0763)
Title
Property and Casualty Insurance - Vessel Liability Coverage - Required
Sponsor
Delegate Barkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1046
Title
Transportation Trust Fund - Dedicated Highway Funds
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1127 /CH0303 (SB0634/CH0302)
Title
Commercial Law - Self-Service Storage Facilities
Sponsor
Delegate Jameson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1453
Title
Criminal Law - Marijuana - Regulation, Penalties, and Taxation
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1505 /CH0689 (SB1032)
Title
Oysters - Power Dredging - Time Period
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0011 /CH0162
Title
Natural Resources - State Boat Act - Expiration of Temporary Certificate of Boat Number
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0074
Title
Vessels - Operating While Under the Influence of or Impaired by Alcohol or Drugs
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0090 /CH0180 (HB0548)
Title
Natural Resources - Vessel Excise Tax - Waterway Improvement Fund
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0451 (HB0412)
Title
Vessel Excise Tax - Exemption for Commercial Enterprises Paying the Admissions and Amusement Tax
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0634 /CH0302 (HB1127/CH0303)
Title
Commercial Law - Self-Service Storage Facilities
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0763 (HB0954)
Title
Property and Casualty Insurance - Vessel Liability Coverage - Required
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0780
Title
Limited Lines Insurance Licenses - Self-Service Storage Agents
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0827 (HB0660)
Title
Streamlined Tax Administration Act of 2013
Sponsor
Senator Garagiola
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1032 (HB1505/CH0689)
Title
Oysters - Power Dredging - Time Period
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0412 (SB0451) Vessel Excise Tax - Exemption for Commercial Enterprises Paying the Admissions and Amusement Tax Delegate George 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/04/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0514 Recreational Hunting or Fishing License Applications - Disclosure of Information Delegate O'Donnell 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0548 (SB0090/CH0180) Natural Resources - Vessel Excise Tax - Maximum Tax Delegate George 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0660 (SB0827) Streamlined Tax Administration Act of 2013 Delegate Davis 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0954 (SB0763) Property and Casualty Insurance - Vessel Liability Coverage - Required Delegate Barkley 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1046 Transportation Trust Fund - Dedicated Highway Funds Delegate Krebs 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1127 /CH0303 (SB0634/CH0302) Commercial Law - Self-Service Storage Facilities Delegate Jameson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 303
Economic Matters
3/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1453 Criminal Law - Marijuana - Regulation, Penalties, and Taxation Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1505 /CH0689 (SB1032) Oysters - Power Dredging - Time Period Delegate Jacobs 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 689
Environmental Matters
3/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0011 /CH0162 Natural Resources - State Boat Act - Expiration of Temporary Certificate of Boat Number Senator Astle 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 162
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/23/2013 - 2:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0074 Vessels - Operating While Under the Influence of or Impaired by Alcohol or Drugs Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0)
Judicial Proceedings
1/17/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0090 /CH0180 (HB0548) Natural Resources - Vessel Excise Tax - Waterway Improvement Fund Senator Astle 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 180
Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/04/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0451 (HB0412) Vessel Excise Tax - Exemption for Commercial Enterprises Paying the Admissions and Amusement Tax Senator Astle 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0634 /CH0302 (HB1127/CH0303) Commercial Law - Self-Service Storage Facilities Senator Peters 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 302
Finance
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0763 (HB0954) Property and Casualty Insurance - Vessel Liability Coverage - Required Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0780 Limited Lines Insurance Licenses - Self-Service Storage Agents Senator Peters 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0827 (HB0660) Streamlined Tax Administration Act of 2013 Senator Garagiola 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
3/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB1032 (HB1505/CH0689) Oysters - Power Dredging - Time Period Senator Colburn 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/03/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM