Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Boats and Ships

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0299
Title
State Boat Act - Certificate of Number Fee - Altering Motor Horsepower for Fee Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Glass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0603 (SB0490/CH0174)
Title
Limited Lines Insurance Licenses - Self-Service Storage Producers
Sponsor
Delegate Jameson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0649
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Harford County - Havre de Grace Maritime Museum
Sponsor
Delegate James
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0835
Title
Criminal Law - Motor Vehicles - Criminal Negligence Resulting in Death
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1368 (SB1083)
Title
State Boat Act - Dealer's License - Lienholder Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Bromwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0094
Title
Vessels - Operating While Under the Influence of or Impaired by Alcohol or Drugs
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0490 /CH0174 (HB0603)
Title
Limited Lines Insurance Licenses - Self-Service Storage Producers
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0565
Title
Criminal Law - Motor Vehicles - Criminal Negligence Resulting in Death
Sponsor
Senator Stone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1083 (HB1368)
Title
State Boat Act - Dealer's License - Lienholder Exemption
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0299 State Boat Act - Certificate of Number Fee - Altering Motor Horsepower for Fee Exemption Delegate Glass 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
2/05/2014 - 2:00 PM
HB0603 (SB0490/CH0174) Limited Lines Insurance Licenses - Self-Service Storage Producers Delegate Jameson 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Economic Matters
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0649 Creation of a State Debt - Harford County - Havre de Grace Maritime Museum Delegate James 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/08/2014 - 4:00 PM
HB0835 Criminal Law - Motor Vehicles - Criminal Negligence Resulting in Death Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1368 (SB1083) State Boat Act - Dealer's License - Lienholder Exemption Delegate Bromwell 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0094 Vessels - Operating While Under the Influence of or Impaired by Alcohol or Drugs Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/16/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0490 /CH0174 (HB0603) Limited Lines Insurance Licenses - Self-Service Storage Producers Senator Astle 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 174
Finance
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0565 Criminal Law - Motor Vehicles - Criminal Negligence Resulting in Death Senator Stone 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB1083 (HB1368) State Boat Act - Dealer's License - Lienholder Exemption Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:29 PM