Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Boats and Ships

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0223 (SB0215/CH0019)
Title
Pilots - Recreational Vessels - Employment Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Hammen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0255
Title
Criminal Procedure - Seizure and Forfeiture - Property Used in Exploitation of Vulnerable Adults
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0395
Title
Death or Life-Threatening Injury by Motor Vehicle or Vessel - Subsequent Offenders - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0831 (SB0878)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Harford County - Regional Fire and Rescue Boat
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0860 /CH0461
Title
Aquatic Invasive Species - Decontamination of Vessels (State Lakes Invasive Species Act of 2015)
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0911 (SB0531)
Title
Marijuana Control and Revenue Act of 2015
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1254
Title
State Boat Act - Registered Vessel - Disclosure of Owner Information
Sponsor
Delegate Arentz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1274
Title
Oysters and Clams - Dredging by Auxiliary Yawl - Authorized Vessels
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0083 /CH0322
Title
Environment - Vibrio Public Information Campaign
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0215 /CH0019 (HB0223)
Title
Pilots - Recreational Vessels - Employment Requirement
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0232
Title
Death or Life-Threatening Injury by Motor Vehicle or Vessel - Subsequent Offenders - Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0531 (HB0911)
Title
Marijuana Control and Revenue Act of 2015
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0878 (HB0831)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Harford County - Regional Fire and Rescue Boat
Sponsor
Harford County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0223 (SB0215/CH0019) Pilots - Recreational Vessels - Employment Requirement Delegate Hammen 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Economic Matters
2/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0255 Criminal Procedure - Seizure and Forfeiture - Property Used in Exploitation of Vulnerable Adults Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/20/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0395 Death or Life-Threatening Injury by Motor Vehicle or Vessel - Subsequent Offenders - Penalties Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
3/04/2015 - 1:15 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0831 (SB0878) Creation of a State Debt - Harford County - Regional Fire and Rescue Boat Delegate Lisanti 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/14/2015 - 10:00 AM
HB0860 /CH0461 Aquatic Invasive Species - Decontamination of Vessels (State Lakes Invasive Species Act of 2015) Delegate Stein 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 461
Environment and Transportation
3/06/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0911 (SB0531) Marijuana Control and Revenue Act of 2015 Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB1254 State Boat Act - Registered Vessel - Disclosure of Owner Information Delegate Arentz 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1274 Oysters and Clams - Dredging by Auxiliary Yawl - Authorized Vessels Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0083 /CH0322 Environment - Vibrio Public Information Campaign Senator Simonaire 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 322
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0215 /CH0019 (HB0223) Pilots - Recreational Vessels - Employment Requirement Senator Astle 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 19
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0232 Death or Life-Threatening Injury by Motor Vehicle or Vessel - Subsequent Offenders - Penalties Senator Cassilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0531 (HB0911) Marijuana Control and Revenue Act of 2015 Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0878 (HB0831) Creation of a State Debt - Harford County - Regional Fire and Rescue Boat Harford County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/14/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM