Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Boats and Ships

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0055 (SB0998)
Title
Vessels - Certificate of Title - Transfer-on-Death Beneficiary Designation
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0143 /CH0075 (SB0219/CH0076)
Title
State Boat Act - Abandoned or Sunken Vessels - Removal
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0344
Title
Video Lottery Operation License - Expansion and Alterations
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0352 (SB0029)
Title
Criminal Law - Life-Threatening Injury Involving a Motor Vehicle or Vessel - Criminal Negligence (Wade's Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Hartman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0504
Title
Maryland Boat Act - Abandoned and Sunken Vessels
Sponsor
Delegate Metzgar
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0554 /CH0250 (SB0239/CH0251)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Small Yacht Club License
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0696
Title
State Boat Act - Abandoned or Sunken Vessels - Vessels Remaining on Private Property
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1131 /CH0430 (SB0793/CH0431)
Title
Natural Resources - Limited Fishing Guide License - Propulsion of Boats and Vessels
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1139 (SB1010/CH0592)
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Code of Military Justice
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1354
Title
Sales and Use Tax and Personal Property Tax – Services, Aircraft Parts and Equipment, and Data Centers
Sponsor
Delegate Charkoudian
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1432
Title
Chesapeake Bay Water Transportation Network
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0023 /CH0501
Title
Business Regulation - Trademarks, Service Marks, and Trade Names - Registration
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0029 (HB0352)
Title
Criminal Law – Workgroup on Criminal and Gross Negligence
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0114 /CH0528
Title
Natural Resources - Nuisance Organisms - Pilot Projects and Northern Snakeheads
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0219 /CH0076 (HB0143/CH0075)
Title
State Boat Act - Abandoned or Sunken Vessels - Removal
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0239 /CH0251 (HB0554/CH0250)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Small Yacht Club License
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0793 /CH0431 (HB1131/CH0430)
Title
Natural Resources - Limited Fishing Guide License - Propulsion of Boats and Vessels
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0948
Title
Natural Resources - Commercial Oyster Authorizations - Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0998 (HB0055)
Title
Vessels - Certificate of Title - Transfer-on-Death Beneficiary Designation
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1010 /CH0592 (HB1139)
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Code of Military Justice
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0055 (SB0998) Vessels - Certificate of Title - Transfer-on-Death Beneficiary Designation Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
1/29/2020 - 2:00 PM
HB0143 /CH0075 (SB0219/CH0076) State Boat Act - Abandoned or Sunken Vessels - Removal Delegate Kipke 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 75
Environment and Transportation
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0344 Video Lottery Operation License - Expansion and Alterations Charles County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
HB0352 (SB0029) Criminal Law - Life-Threatening Injury Involving a Motor Vehicle or Vessel - Criminal Negligence (Wade's Law) Delegate Hartman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0504 Maryland Boat Act - Abandoned and Sunken Vessels Delegate Metzgar 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0554 /CH0250 (SB0239/CH0251) Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Small Yacht Club License Anne Arundel County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 250
Economic Matters
2/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0696 State Boat Act - Abandoned or Sunken Vessels - Vessels Remaining on Private Property Delegate Malone 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/21/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1131 /CH0430 (SB0793/CH0431) Natural Resources - Limited Fishing Guide License - Propulsion of Boats and Vessels Delegate Mautz 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 430
Environment and Transportation
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1139 (SB1010/CH0592) Public Safety - Maryland Code of Military Justice Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1354 Sales and Use Tax and Personal Property Tax – Services, Aircraft Parts and Equipment, and Data Centers Delegate Charkoudian 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
Ways and Means
3/02/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1432 Chesapeake Bay Water Transportation Network Delegate Lisanti 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0023 /CH0501 Business Regulation - Trademarks, Service Marks, and Trade Names - Registration Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 501
Finance
1/16/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/16/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0029 (HB0352) Criminal Law – Workgroup on Criminal and Gross Negligence Senator Carozza 2 2 In the House - First Reading Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
1/14/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0114 /CH0528 Natural Resources - Nuisance Organisms - Pilot Projects and Northern Snakeheads Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 528
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/23/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0219 /CH0076 (HB0143/CH0075) State Boat Act - Abandoned or Sunken Vessels - Removal Senator Elfreth 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 76
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/29/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0239 /CH0251 (HB0554/CH0250) Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Small Yacht Club License Senator Reilly 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 251
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0793 /CH0431 (HB1131/CH0430) Natural Resources - Limited Fishing Guide License - Propulsion of Boats and Vessels Senator Hershey 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 431
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0948 Natural Resources - Commercial Oyster Authorizations - Requirements Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0998 (HB0055) Vessels - Certificate of Title - Transfer-on-Death Beneficiary Designation Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SB1010 /CH0592 (HB1139) Public Safety - Maryland Code of Military Justice Senator Peters 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 592
Judicial Proceedings
3/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/17/2020 12:35 PM