Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Bonds -see also- County & Baltimore City Bonds; State Bonds

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0094
Title
Environment - Water Quality Revolving Loan Fund - Uses of Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0310 (SB0323)
Title
Maryland Arts Capital Grant Program
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0502 (SB0456)
Title
Office of the State’s Attorney – Collection and Publication of Prosecutorial Information
Sponsor
Delegate Crutchfield
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0568
Title
Human Services - Maryland Baby Bond Account Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0581 (SB0486)
Title
Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Davis, D.E.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0664 (SB0532)
Title
Financial Institutions - Consumer Credit - Sales-Based Financing Transactions
Sponsor
Delegate Howard
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0740 (SB0576)
Title
Building Opportunity Act of 2021
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0816
Title
Family Law - Support of Destitute Adult Children - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Shoemaker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0830
Title
Community Development Administration - Financial Assistance Programs - Prohibitions
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1065
Title
Bond Authority – Maryland State Ceiling and Housing Bond Allocations
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1162 (SB0926)
Title
Economic Development – Maryland Stadium Authority – Hagerstown Multi–Use Sports and Events Facility
Sponsor
Delegate Thiam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1324 (SB0883)
Title
Tobacco Tax – Out–of–State Sales of Premium Cigars and Pipe Tobacco
Sponsor
Delegate Young, P.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1341
Title
University System of Maryland - Academic Facilities Bonding Authority
Sponsor
Chair, Appropriations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0175
Title
Procurement - Performance and Payment Security - Requirements and Limitations
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0182
Title
State Finance – General Obligation Debt – Application of Minority Business Participation Goals
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0259
Title
Department of Transportation - Grant Anticipation Revenue Vehicle Bonds - Calculation of Debt Limit
Sponsor
Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0323 (HB0310)
Title
Maryland Arts Capital Grant Program
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0456 (HB0502)
Title
Office of the State's Attorney - Collection and Publication of Prosecutorial Information
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0486 (HB0581)
Title
Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act)
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0532 (HB0664)
Title
Financial Institutions - Consumer Credit - Sales-Based Financing Transactions
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0576 (HB0740)
Title
Building Opportunity Act of 2021
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0775
Title
Family Law - Child Custody and Visitation - Abuse
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0883 (HB1324)
Title
Tobacco Tax – Out–of–State Sales of Premium Cigars and Pipe Tobacco
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0926 (HB1162)
Title
Economic Development – Maryland Stadium Authority – Hagerstown Multi–Use Sports and Events Facility
Sponsor
Senator Corderman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0094 Environment - Water Quality Revolving Loan Fund - Uses of Fund Delegate Stein 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
1/20/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0310 (SB0323) Maryland Arts Capital Grant Program Delegate Lierman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m.
Appropriations
1/20/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0502 (SB0456) Office of the State’s Attorney – Collection and Publication of Prosecutorial Information Delegate Crutchfield 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB0568 Human Services - Maryland Baby Bond Account Program - Establishment Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
HB0581 (SB0486) Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act) Delegate Davis, D.E. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/05 at 11:00 a.m. (Economic Matters)
Economic Matters
2/05/2021 - 11:00 AM
Appropriations
HB0664 (SB0532) Financial Institutions - Consumer Credit - Sales-Based Financing Transactions Delegate Howard 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0740 (SB0576) Building Opportunity Act of 2021 Speaker 3 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
HB0816 Family Law - Support of Destitute Adult Children - Repeal Delegate Shoemaker 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/18/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0830 Community Development Administration - Financial Assistance Programs - Prohibitions Delegate Lierman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
HB1065 Bond Authority – Maryland State Ceiling and Housing Bond Allocations Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
HB1162 (SB0926) Economic Development – Maryland Stadium Authority – Hagerstown Multi–Use Sports and Events Facility Delegate Thiam 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
HB1324 (SB0883) Tobacco Tax – Out–of–State Sales of Premium Cigars and Pipe Tobacco Delegate Young, P. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
3/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
HB1341 University System of Maryland - Academic Facilities Bonding Authority Chair, Appropriations Committee 5 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Appropriations
3/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0175 Procurement - Performance and Payment Security - Requirements and Limitations Senator Ellis 2 2 In the House - First Reading Health and Government Operations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/03/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0182 State Finance – General Obligation Debt – Application of Minority Business Participation Goals Senator Ellis 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/03/2021 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0259 Department of Transportation - Grant Anticipation Revenue Vehicle Bonds - Calculation of Debt Limit Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/27/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0323 (HB0310) Maryland Arts Capital Grant Program Senator Elfreth 2 2 In the House - First Reading Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
1/14/2021 - 11:00 AM
Appropriations
SB0456 (HB0502) Office of the State's Attorney - Collection and Publication of Prosecutorial Information Senator Sydnor 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0486 (HB0581) Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act) Senator Augustine 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/11/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0532 (HB0664) Financial Institutions - Consumer Credit - Sales-Based Financing Transactions Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/23/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0576 (HB0740) Building Opportunity Act of 2021 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Budget and Taxation
SB0775 Family Law - Child Custody and Visitation - Abuse Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Judicial Proceedings
SB0883 (HB1324) Tobacco Tax – Out–of–State Sales of Premium Cigars and Pipe Tobacco Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the Senate - Reassigned to Budget and Taxation and Finance
Budget and Taxation
3/03/2021 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0926 (HB1162) Economic Development – Maryland Stadium Authority – Hagerstown Multi–Use Sports and Events Facility Senator Corderman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/5/2021 3:03 PM
Click to return on the top page