Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Boundaries

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0071
Title
Homeowner's Insurance - Underwriting Based on Geographic Area
Sponsor
Delegate O'Donnell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0233
Title
Elections - Study Commission on the Redistricting Process in Maryland
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0236
Title
Election Law - Districting Plan Questions - Inclusion of Map
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0413 (SB0010)
Title
Baltimore County - Board of Education - Selection of Members
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0472 /CH0119
Title
Local Government Article
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0561 /CH0315 (SB0748/CH0314)
Title
Agriculture - Nutrient Management - Limiting Applicability
Sponsor
Delegate Hubbard
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0639 /CH0627
Title
Maryland-Washington Regional District - Boundaries - City of Laurel MC/PG 111-13
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0670 /CH0132
Title
Montgomery County - Board of Education Districts - Town of Kensington in One District MC 1-13
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0730 (SB0542/CH0498)
Title
Election Law - Polling Places - Electioneering
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0832 (SB0361)
Title
Congressional Districting Process
Sponsor
Delegate Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0835 (SB0948)
Title
Environment - Retail Service Stations - Setback Certification
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0971 (SB0107)
Title
Anne Arundel County - School Board - Membership
Sponsor
Delegate McConkey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1060
Title
Washington County - Polling Places - Electioneering Boundaries
Sponsor
Washington County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1199
Title
Citizens' Congressional Redistricting Commission
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1269 (SB0240)
Title
Task Force to Study Redistricting in Maryland
Sponsor
Delegate Braveboy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0010 (HB0413)
Title
Baltimore County - Board of Education - Selection of Members
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0107 (HB0971)
Title
Anne Arundel County - School Board - Membership
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0240 (HB1269)
Title
Task Force to Study Redistricting in Maryland
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0361 (HB0832)
Title
Congressional Districting Process
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0542 /CH0498 (HB0730)
Title
Election Law - Polling Places - Electioneering
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0748 /CH0314 (HB0561/CH0315)
Title
Agriculture - Nutrient Management - Limiting Applicability
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0940
Title
Baltimore County and Carroll County - Authority to Place Boundary Monuments
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0948 (HB0835)
Title
Environment - Retail Service Stations - Setback Certification
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1071
Title
Prince George's County - School System - Academic Revitalization and Management Effectiveness Initiative
Sponsor
Prince George's County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0071 Homeowner's Insurance - Underwriting Based on Geographic Area Delegate O'Donnell 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
1/31/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0233 Elections - Study Commission on the Redistricting Process in Maryland Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/11/2013 - 2:00 PM
HB0236 Election Law - Districting Plan Questions - Inclusion of Map Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/11/2013 - 2:00 PM
HB0413 (SB0010) Baltimore County - Board of Education - Selection of Members Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0472 /CH0119 Local Government Article Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 119
Environmental Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0561 /CH0315 (SB0748/CH0314) Agriculture - Nutrient Management - Limiting Applicability Delegate Hubbard 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 315
Environmental Matters
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0639 /CH0627 Maryland-Washington Regional District - Boundaries - City of Laurel MC/PG 111-13 Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 627
Environmental Matters
3/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0670 /CH0132 Montgomery County - Board of Education Districts - Town of Kensington in One District MC 1-13 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 132
Ways and Means
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0730 (SB0542/CH0498) Election Law - Polling Places - Electioneering Delegate Parrott 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Ways and Means
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0832 (SB0361) Congressional Districting Process Delegate Norman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/11/2013 - 2:00 PM
HB0835 (SB0948) Environment - Retail Service Stations - Setback Certification Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0971 (SB0107) Anne Arundel County - School Board - Membership Delegate McConkey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1060 Washington County - Polling Places - Electioneering Boundaries Washington County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
HB1199 Citizens' Congressional Redistricting Commission Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/11/2013 - 2:00 PM
HB1269 (SB0240) Task Force to Study Redistricting in Maryland Delegate Braveboy 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; Withdrawn
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/11/2013 - 2:00 PM
SB0010 (HB0413) Baltimore County - Board of Education - Selection of Members Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/24/2013 - 1:30 PM
SB0107 (HB0971) Anne Arundel County - School Board - Membership Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/24/2013 - 1:30 PM
SB0240 (HB1269) Task Force to Study Redistricting in Maryland Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0361 (HB0832) Congressional Districting Process Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0542 /CH0498 (HB0730) Election Law - Polling Places - Electioneering Senator Young 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 498
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0748 /CH0314 (HB0561/CH0315) Agriculture - Nutrient Management - Limiting Applicability Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 314
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/03/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0940 Baltimore County and Carroll County - Authority to Place Boundary Monuments Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0948 (HB0835) Environment - Retail Service Stations - Setback Certification Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB1071 Prince George's County - School System - Academic Revitalization and Management Effectiveness Initiative Prince George's County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM