Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Boundaries

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0270 /CH0094
Title
General Provisions Article
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0296 /CH0465 (SB0336)
Title
Natural Resources - Wildlands - Designation of New Wildlands
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0698
Title
Elections - Study Commission on the Redistricting Process in Maryland
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0915 (SB0740)
Title
Election Law - General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Districting and Apportionment Commission
Sponsor
Delegate George
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0969 /CH0104
Title
General Provisions - Cross-References and Corrections
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0970
Title
General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Redistricting and Apportionment Commission
Sponsor
Delegate Hogan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1155 (SB0466)
Title
Oyster Dredging - Waters North of the Chesapeake Bay Bridge and Kent Narrows Bridge
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1176
Title
Maryland Constitution - Congressional Districts - Requirements as to Territory, Form, and Boundaries
Sponsor
Delegate Braveboy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1195
Title
General Assembly - Legislative Redistricting - Plans to be Introduced as a Bill
Sponsor
Delegate Braveboy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1213
Title
Maryland Congressional Redistricting Commission
Sponsor
Delegate Mizeur
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1217
Title
Task Force to Study Redistricting in Maryland
Sponsor
Delegate Braveboy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1327 (SB0582)
Title
Election Law - Redistricting Ballot Questions - Map of Proposed Districts
Sponsor
Delegate George
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1373
Title
Environment - Permits to Construct or Materially Alter an Incinerator - Limitations on Issuance
Sponsor
Delegate Niemann
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1383
Title
Environment - Retail Service Stations - Setback Certification
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0004
Title
United States Constitutional Convention - Legislative Districting and Apportionment
Sponsor
Delegate Frick
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0336 (HB0296/CH0465)
Title
Natural Resources - Wildlands - Designation of New Wildlands
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0414
Title
General Assembly - Legislative Redistricting - Plans to be Introduced as a Bill
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0466 (HB1155)
Title
Oyster Dredging - Waters North of the Chesapeake Bay Bridge and Kent Narrows Bridge
Sponsor
Senator Dyson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0582 (HB1327)
Title
Election Law - Redistricting Ballot Questions - Map of Proposed Districts
Sponsor
Senator Stone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0600 /CH0530 (HB0742/CH0531)
Title
Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise Zone Program
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0631
Title
Environment - Retail Service Stations - Setback Certification
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0635
Title
Anne Arundel County - School Board - Membership
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0740 (HB0915)
Title
Election Law - General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Districting and Apportionment Commission
Sponsor
Senator Kittleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0772
Title
Transit Benefit Districts
Sponsor
Senator DeGrange
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0270 /CH0094 General Provisions Article Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 94
Health and Government Operations
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0296 /CH0465 (SB0336) Natural Resources - Wildlands - Designation of New Wildlands Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 465
Environmental Matters
2/05/2014 - 2:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0698 Elections - Study Commission on the Redistricting Process in Maryland Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/03/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0915 (SB0740) Election Law - General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Districting and Apportionment Commission Delegate George 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/03/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0969 /CH0104 General Provisions - Cross-References and Corrections Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 104
Health and Government Operations
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0970 General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Redistricting and Apportionment Commission Delegate Hogan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/03/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1155 (SB0466) Oyster Dredging - Waters North of the Chesapeake Bay Bridge and Kent Narrows Bridge Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1176 Maryland Constitution - Congressional Districts - Requirements as to Territory, Form, and Boundaries Delegate Braveboy 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/10/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1195 General Assembly - Legislative Redistricting - Plans to be Introduced as a Bill Delegate Braveboy 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/10/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1213 Maryland Congressional Redistricting Commission Delegate Mizeur 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/10/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1217 Task Force to Study Redistricting in Maryland Delegate Braveboy 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/10/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1327 (SB0582) Election Law - Redistricting Ballot Questions - Map of Proposed Districts Delegate George 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/03/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1373 Environment - Permits to Construct or Materially Alter an Incinerator - Limitations on Issuance Delegate Niemann 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1383 Environment - Retail Service Stations - Setback Certification Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HJ0004 United States Constitutional Convention - Legislative Districting and Apportionment Delegate Frick 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/10/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0336 (HB0296/CH0465) Natural Resources - Wildlands - Designation of New Wildlands President 3 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0414 General Assembly - Legislative Redistricting - Plans to be Introduced as a Bill Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0466 (HB1155) Oyster Dredging - Waters North of the Chesapeake Bay Bridge and Kent Narrows Bridge Senator Dyson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0582 (HB1327) Election Law - Redistricting Ballot Questions - Map of Proposed Districts Senator Stone 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0600 /CH0530 (HB0742/CH0531) Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise Zone Program Senator Pugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 530
Budget and Taxation
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0631 Environment - Retail Service Stations - Setback Certification Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0635 Anne Arundel County - School Board - Membership Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0740 (HB0915) Election Law - General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Districting and Apportionment Commission Senator Kittleman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0772 Transit Benefit Districts Senator DeGrange 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 2:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/05/2014 - 2:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:29 PM