Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Bridges and Tunnels

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0472 /CH0119
Title
Local Government Article
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0605
Title
Public-Private Partnerships
Sponsor
Delegate Clagett
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0797 /CH0140
Title
Transportation Projects - Transportation Facilities - Water Access
Sponsor
Delegate McIntosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1046
Title
Transportation Trust Fund - Dedicated Highway Funds
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1244 (SB0795)
Title
Oyster Dredging - Waters North of the Chesapeake Bay Bridge and Kent Narrows Bridge
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1325
Title
Transportation - Capital Projects - Life Cycle Cost Analysis
Sponsor
Delegate Wood
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1372 /CH0430 (SB0934)
Title
Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Jones
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1528
Title
Natural Resources - Patuxent River - Drifting Gill Nets
Sponsor
Delegate O'Donnell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0093
Title
Transportation - Chesapeake Bay Bridge Crossing - Environmental Impact Study for a Third Span
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0132
Title
Cecil-Harford Highway Impact Revenue Account
Sponsor
Senator Glassman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0299
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Washington County - Lockhouse 44, Lock 44, and Western MD Railroad Lift Bridge
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0795 (HB1244)
Title
Oyster Dredging - Waters North of the Chesapeake Bay Bridge and Kent Narrows Bridge
Sponsor
Senator Pipkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0906
Title
Transportation - Life Cycle Cost Analysis
Sponsor
Senator DeGrange
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0934 (HB1372/CH0430)
Title
Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - Alterations
Sponsor
Senator DeGrange
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0005
Title
Public-Private Partnerships
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0472 /CH0119 Local Government Article Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 119
Environmental Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0605 Public-Private Partnerships Delegate Clagett 2 2 In the House - Hearing cancelled (Environmental Matters)
Environmental Matters
Appropriations
HB0797 /CH0140 Transportation Projects - Transportation Facilities - Water Access Delegate McIntosh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 140
Environmental Matters
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1046 Transportation Trust Fund - Dedicated Highway Funds Delegate Krebs 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1244 (SB0795) Oyster Dredging - Waters North of the Chesapeake Bay Bridge and Kent Narrows Bridge Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
3/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1325 Transportation - Capital Projects - Life Cycle Cost Analysis Delegate Wood 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Ways and Means
3/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB1372 /CH0430 (SB0934) Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - Alterations Delegate Jones 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 430
Appropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1528 Natural Resources - Patuxent River - Drifting Gill Nets Delegate O'Donnell 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
3/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0093 Transportation - Chesapeake Bay Bridge Crossing - Environmental Impact Study for a Third Span Senator Astle 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/23 at 2:30 p.m.
Finance
1/23/2013 - 2:30 PM
SB0132 Cecil-Harford Highway Impact Revenue Account Senator Glassman 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Budget and Taxation
2/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0299 Creation of a State Debt - Washington County - Lockhouse 44, Lock 44, and Western MD Railroad Lift Bridge Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 12:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2013 - 12:00 PM
SB0795 (HB1244) Oyster Dredging - Waters North of the Chesapeake Bay Bridge and Kent Narrows Bridge Senator Pipkin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0906 Transportation - Life Cycle Cost Analysis Senator DeGrange 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SB0934 (HB1372/CH0430) Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - Alterations Senator DeGrange 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/15/2013 - 1:00 PM
SJ0005 Public-Private Partnerships Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Budget and Taxation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM