Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Bridges and Tunnels

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0389 /CH0397 (SB0730)
Title
Maryland Transportation Authority - All-Electronic Tolling - Study
Sponsor
Delegate Rudolph
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0643 (SB0791)
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Toll Charges Paid by Baltimore Area or Chesapeake Bay Bridge Commuters
Sponsor
Delegate Olszewski
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0870 (SB0245)
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Toll Charges Paid by Chesapeake Bay Bridge or Hatem Bridge Commuters
Sponsor
Delegate Smigiel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0877
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Qualified Maryland Toll Expenses
Sponsor
Delegate Weir
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1177
Title
Maryland Transportation Authority - E-ZPass Discount Plans - Removal of Time Limitations
Sponsor
Delegate Glass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1263
Title
Maryland Transportation Authority - Chesapeake Bay Bridge - Toll Collection
Sponsor
Delegate McConkey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1382
Title
Maryland Transportation Authority - Toll Increases - Legislative Approval Required
Sponsor
Delegate Bromwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0245 (HB0870)
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Toll Charges Paid by Chesapeake Bay Bridge or Hatem Bridge Commuters
Sponsor
Senator Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0730 (HB0389/CH0397)
Title
Maryland Transportation Authority - All-Electronic Tolling - Study
Sponsor
Senator Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0791 (HB0643)
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Toll Charges Paid by Baltimore Area or Chesapeake Bay Bridge Commuters
Sponsor
Senator Stone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0902
Title
Transportation - Chesapeake Bay Bridge Crossing - Environmental Impact Study - Cost Estimate and Payment
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0389 /CH0397 (SB0730) Maryland Transportation Authority - All-Electronic Tolling - Study Delegate Rudolph 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 397
Ways and Means
2/06/2014 - 2:15 PM
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0643 (SB0791) Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Toll Charges Paid by Baltimore Area or Chesapeake Bay Bridge Commuters Delegate Olszewski 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0870 (SB0245) Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Toll Charges Paid by Chesapeake Bay Bridge or Hatem Bridge Commuters Delegate Smigiel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0877 Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Qualified Maryland Toll Expenses Delegate Weir 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1177 Maryland Transportation Authority - E-ZPass Discount Plans - Removal of Time Limitations Delegate Glass 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1263 Maryland Transportation Authority - Chesapeake Bay Bridge - Toll Collection Delegate McConkey 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1382 Maryland Transportation Authority - Toll Increases - Legislative Approval Required Delegate Bromwell 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0245 (HB0870) Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Toll Charges Paid by Chesapeake Bay Bridge or Hatem Bridge Commuters Senator Jacobs 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Budget and Taxation
SB0730 (HB0389/CH0397) Maryland Transportation Authority - All-Electronic Tolling - Study Senator Jacobs 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Finance
3/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0791 (HB0643) Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Toll Charges Paid by Baltimore Area or Chesapeake Bay Bridge Commuters Senator Stone 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0902 Transportation - Chesapeake Bay Bridge Crossing - Environmental Impact Study - Cost Estimate and Payment Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:29 PM