Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Bridges and Tunnels

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0015
Title
Maryland Transportation Authority - Chesapeake Bay Bridge - Toll Collection
Sponsor
Delegate McConkey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0214
Title
Maryland Transportation Authority - Francis Scott Key Bridge - Toll Discount Plans
Sponsor
Delegate Metzgar
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0408
Title
Maryland Transportation Authority - E-ZPass Account Maintenance Charge - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0466 /CH0053 (SB0802/CH0052)
Title
Transportation - Dedication of Structures (Hero's Highway Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Folden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0506 (SB0410/CH0168)
Title
Baltimore City - Vehicle Laws - Traffic Safety
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0599 /CH0439 (SB0839)
Title
St. Mary's County - Violations of Ordinances, Rules, and Regulations - Penalties
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0747
Title
Thomas J. Hatem Memorial Bridge - Multiple Axle Vehicles - Toll Rates
Sponsor
Cecil County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1162 (SB0913/CH0209)
Title
Washington County - Tax Increment Financing - Application of Bond Proceeds
Sponsor
Washington County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0275
Title
Transportation - Thomas J. Hatem Memorial Bridge - Discounted Variable Toll Rate for Commuters
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0379
Title
Transportation - Francis Scott Key Bridge Authority
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0410 /CH0168 (HB0506)
Title
Baltimore City - Vehicle Laws - Traffic Safety
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0802 /CH0052 (HB0466/CH0053)
Title
Transportation - Dedication of Structures (Hero's Highway Act)
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0839 (HB0599/CH0439)
Title
St. Mary's County - Violations of Ordinances, Rules, and Regulations - Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0907
Title
Ironworkers - Apprenticeship Program and Certification Program and Use of Certified Ironworkers on Construction Projects
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0913 /CH0209 (HB1162)
Title
Washington County - Tax Increment Financing - Application of Bond Proceeds
Sponsor
Washington County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0015 Maryland Transportation Authority - Chesapeake Bay Bridge - Toll Collection Delegate McConkey 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
2/05/2015 - 2:00 PM
HB0214 Maryland Transportation Authority - Francis Scott Key Bridge - Toll Discount Plans Delegate Metzgar 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0408 Maryland Transportation Authority - E-ZPass Account Maintenance Charge - Prohibition Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0466 /CH0053 (SB0802/CH0052) Transportation - Dedication of Structures (Hero's Highway Act) Delegate Folden 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 53
Environment and Transportation
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/07/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0506 (SB0410/CH0168) Baltimore City - Vehicle Laws - Traffic Safety Delegate Anderson 4 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Environment and Transportation
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0599 /CH0439 (SB0839) St. Mary's County - Violations of Ordinances, Rules, and Regulations - Penalties St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 439
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0747 Thomas J. Hatem Memorial Bridge - Multiple Axle Vehicles - Toll Rates Cecil County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1162 (SB0913/CH0209) Washington County - Tax Increment Financing - Application of Bond Proceeds Washington County Delegation 4 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0275 Transportation - Thomas J. Hatem Memorial Bridge - Discounted Variable Toll Rate for Commuters Senator Norman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0379 Transportation - Francis Scott Key Bridge Authority Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0410 /CH0168 (HB0506) Baltimore City - Vehicle Laws - Traffic Safety Senator Gladden 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 168
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0802 /CH0052 (HB0466/CH0053) Transportation - Dedication of Structures (Hero's Highway Act) Senator Cassilly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 52
Finance
3/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0839 (HB0599/CH0439) St. Mary's County - Violations of Ordinances, Rules, and Regulations - Penalties Senator Waugh 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0907 Ironworkers - Apprenticeship Program and Certification Program and Use of Certified Ironworkers on Construction Projects Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing cancelled
Finance
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0913 /CH0209 (HB1162) Washington County - Tax Increment Financing - Application of Bond Proceeds Washington County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 209
Budget and Taxation
3/24/2015 - 1:30 PM
Ways and Means
4/08/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM