Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Bridges and Tunnels

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0035
Title
Maryland Transportation Authority - Chesapeake Bay Bridge - Toll Collection
Sponsor
Delegate McConkey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0073 (SB0210)
Title
Intercounty Connector - Public School Bus - Exemption From Toll
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0240
Title
Maryland Transportation Authority - Toll Rates
Sponsor
Delegate Impallaria
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0296
Title
Maryland Transportation Authority - Vehicle Not Using Bridge - Toll Prohibited
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0611
Title
Vehicle Laws - Civil Penalty for Failure to Pay Video Toll - Limitation
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0647 (SB0543)
Title
Video Lottery Facilities - Charles County - Expansion and Use of Proceeds
Sponsor
Delegate Jameson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0672 (SB0907)
Title
Transportation - Harry W. Nice Memorial Potomac River Bridge - Replacement
Sponsor
Delegate Jameson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0964
Title
Maryland Transportation Authority - Francis Scott Key Bridge - Toll Discount Plans
Sponsor
Delegate Metzgar
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1013 /CH0036 (SB0908)
Title
Maryland Open Transportation Investment Decision Act of 2016
Sponsor
Delegate Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1394
Title
Maryland Transportation Authority - Decreases in Tolls or Other Charges - Notice and Public Comment
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0056
Title
Transportation - Chesapeake Bay Bridge Crossing - Environmental Impact Study - Cost Estimate and Payment
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0061 /CH0043
Title
Natural Resources - Forest Lands and the Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Miscellaneous Corrections and Clarifications
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0210 (HB0073)
Title
Intercounty Connector - Public School Bus - Exemption From Toll
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0416
Title
Transportation - Toll Transportation Facilities Project - Annual Pass - Study
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0500
Title
Transportation - Francis Scott Key Bridge Authority
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0543 (HB0647)
Title
Video Lottery Facilities - Charles County - Expansion and Use of Proceeds
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0907 (HB0672)
Title
Transportation - Harry W. Nice Memorial Potomac River Bridge - Replacement
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0908 (HB1013/CH0036)
Title
Maryland Open Transportation Investment Decision Act of 2016
Sponsor
Senator DeGrange
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0035 Maryland Transportation Authority - Chesapeake Bay Bridge - Toll Collection Delegate McConkey 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
1/28/2016 - 1:30 PM
HB0073 (SB0210) Intercounty Connector - Public School Bus - Exemption From Toll Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/04/2016 - 2:00 PM
HB0240 Maryland Transportation Authority - Toll Rates Delegate Impallaria 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/11/2016 - 1:30 PM
HB0296 Maryland Transportation Authority - Vehicle Not Using Bridge - Toll Prohibited Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0611 Vehicle Laws - Civil Penalty for Failure to Pay Video Toll - Limitation Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0647 (SB0543) Video Lottery Facilities - Charles County - Expansion and Use of Proceeds Delegate Jameson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0672 (SB0907) Transportation - Harry W. Nice Memorial Potomac River Bridge - Replacement Delegate Jameson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Appropriations
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
HB0964 Maryland Transportation Authority - Francis Scott Key Bridge - Toll Discount Plans Delegate Metzgar 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1013 /CH0036 (SB0908) Maryland Open Transportation Investment Decision Act of 2016 Delegate Beidle 2 2 Gubernatorial Veto Override - Chapter 36
Appropriations
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1394 Maryland Transportation Authority - Decreases in Tolls or Other Charges - Notice and Public Comment Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0056 Transportation - Chesapeake Bay Bridge Crossing - Environmental Impact Study - Cost Estimate and Payment Senator Mathias 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
1/20/2016 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0061 /CH0043 Natural Resources - Forest Lands and the Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Miscellaneous Corrections and Clarifications Senator Simonaire 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 43
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/19/2016 - 2:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0210 (HB0073) Intercounty Connector - Public School Bus - Exemption From Toll Senator King 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0416 Transportation - Toll Transportation Facilities Project - Annual Pass - Study Senator Salling 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Finance
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0500 Transportation - Francis Scott Key Bridge Authority Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0543 (HB0647) Video Lottery Facilities - Charles County - Expansion and Use of Proceeds Senator Middleton 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0907 (HB0672) Transportation - Harry W. Nice Memorial Potomac River Bridge - Replacement Senator Middleton 2 2 Veto sustained (0-45)
Finance
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
4/05/2016 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0908 (HB1013/CH0036) Maryland Open Transportation Investment Decision Act of 2016 Senator DeGrange 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/14/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:32 PM