Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Bridges and Tunnels

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0049
Title
Maryland Transportation Authority - Chesapeake Bay Bridge - Toll Collection
Sponsor
Delegate McConkey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0082 /CH0681 (SB0125/CH0682)
Title
Woodrow Wilson Bridge and Tunnel Compact - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0290 /CH0719 (SB0536)
Title
Maryland Transportation Authority - Third Generation-Electronic Toll Collection System
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0402 (SB0307/CH0030)
Title
Repeal of the Maryland Open Transportation Investment Decision Act of 2016 (Road Kill Bill Repeal)
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0466 (SB0870)
Title
Prevailing Wage - Tax Increment Financing Developments - Application
Sponsor
Delegate McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0951 /CH0711 (SB1157/CH0712)
Title
State Highway Administration - Alfred B. Hilton Memorial Bridge - Dedication
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0125 /CH0682 (HB0082/CH0681)
Title
Woodrow Wilson Bridge and Tunnel Compact - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0292
Title
Transportation - Baltimore Harbor Tunnel, Fort McHenry Tunnel, and Francis Scott Key Bridge - Annual Pass Study
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0307 /CH0030 (HB0402)
Title
Maryland Open Transportation Investment Decision Act - Application and Evaluation
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0536 (HB0290/CH0719)
Title
Maryland Transportation Authority - Third Generation-Electronic Toll Collection System
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0870 (HB0466)
Title
Prevailing Wage - Tax Increment Financing Developments - Application
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1157 /CH0712 (HB0951/CH0711)
Title
State Highway Administration - Alfred B. Hilton Memorial Bridge - Dedication
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0049 Maryland Transportation Authority - Chesapeake Bay Bridge - Toll Collection Delegate McConkey 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
1/26/2017 - 2:00 PM
HB0082 /CH0681 (SB0125/CH0682) Woodrow Wilson Bridge and Tunnel Compact - Repeal Delegate Carr 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 681
Environment and Transportation
2/09/2017 - 1:15 PM
Finance
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0290 /CH0719 (SB0536) Maryland Transportation Authority - Third Generation-Electronic Toll Collection System Delegate Grammer 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 719
Environment and Transportation
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0402 (SB0307/CH0030) Repeal of the Maryland Open Transportation Investment Decision Act of 2016 (Road Kill Bill Repeal) Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Appropriations
3/03/2017 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
HB0466 (SB0870) Prevailing Wage - Tax Increment Financing Developments - Application Delegate McCray 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0951 /CH0711 (SB1157/CH0712) State Highway Administration - Alfred B. Hilton Memorial Bridge - Dedication Delegate Lisanti 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 711
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0125 /CH0682 (HB0082/CH0681) Woodrow Wilson Bridge and Tunnel Compact - Repeal Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 682
Finance
2/01/2017 - 2:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0292 Transportation - Baltimore Harbor Tunnel, Fort McHenry Tunnel, and Francis Scott Key Bridge - Annual Pass Study Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0307 /CH0030 (HB0402) Maryland Open Transportation Investment Decision Act - Application and Evaluation President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 30
Budget and Taxation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0536 (HB0290/CH0719) Maryland Transportation Authority - Third Generation-Electronic Toll Collection System Senator Salling 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0870 (HB0466) Prevailing Wage - Tax Increment Financing Developments - Application Senator Mathias 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1157 /CH0712 (HB0951/CH0711) State Highway Administration - Alfred B. Hilton Memorial Bridge - Dedication Senator Cassilly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 712
Finance
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:35 PM