Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Bridges and Tunnels

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0004 /CH0020
Title
Toll Bridges – Renaming Harry W. Nice Memorial Bridge – Harry W. Nice/Thomas "Mac" Middleton Bridge
Sponsor
Delegate Jameson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0009 /CH0278
Title
Transportation - Dedication of Structures
Sponsor
Delegate Folden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0372 /CH0352 (SB0277/CH0351)
Title
Maryland Metro/Transit Funding Act
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0377
Title
Maryland Transportation Authority - Chesapeake Bay Bridge - Toll Collection
Sponsor
Delegate McConkey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0548 (SB1073)
Title
Privately Owned Transportation Projects - Construction and Authorization to Use State-Owned Rights-of-Way and Property - Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Healey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0560 (SB0034)
Title
Chesapeake Bay Bridge Crossing - Eastern Shore Local Government Consent - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0816 /CH0830
Title
Public-Private Partnership Agreements - Compensation Provisions and Noncompete Clauses - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0977
Title
State Highway Administration Neighbor Notification Act
Sponsor
Delegate Wilkins
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1199
Title
Northern Bay Crossing
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1332
Title
Transportation - Francis Scott Key Bridge - Commuter Plan
Sponsor
Delegate Metzgar
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0034 (HB0560)
Title
Chesapeake Bay Bridge Crossing - Eastern Shore Local Government Consent - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0277 /CH0351 (HB0372/CH0352)
Title
Maryland Metro/Transit Funding Act
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0885 /CH0622
Title
Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Condemnation of Land Under Easement
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0935
Title
Maryland Transportation Authority - Broening Highway/Authority Drive Toll Facility - Bypass
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0004 /CH0020 Toll Bridges – Renaming Harry W. Nice Memorial Bridge – Harry W. Nice/Thomas "Mac" Middleton Bridge Delegate Jameson 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 20
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0009 /CH0278 Transportation - Dedication of Structures Delegate Folden 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 278
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0372 /CH0352 (SB0277/CH0351) Maryland Metro/Transit Funding Act Delegate Korman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 352
Appropriations
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0377 Maryland Transportation Authority - Chesapeake Bay Bridge - Toll Collection Delegate McConkey 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0548 (SB1073) Privately Owned Transportation Projects - Construction and Authorization to Use State-Owned Rights-of-Way and Property - Requirements Delegate Healey 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Environment and Transportation
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/09/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0560 (SB0034) Chesapeake Bay Bridge Crossing - Eastern Shore Local Government Consent - Repeal Delegate Malone 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0816 /CH0830 Public-Private Partnership Agreements - Compensation Provisions and Noncompete Clauses - Alterations Delegate Lierman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 830
Environment and Transportation
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0977 State Highway Administration Neighbor Notification Act Delegate Wilkins 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1199 Northern Bay Crossing Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1332 Transportation - Francis Scott Key Bridge - Commuter Plan Delegate Metzgar 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/09/2018 - 2:30 PM
SB0034 (HB0560) Chesapeake Bay Bridge Crossing - Eastern Shore Local Government Consent - Repeal Senator Reilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/24 at 2:30 p.m.
Finance
1/24/2018 - 2:30 PM
SB0277 /CH0351 (HB0372/CH0352) Maryland Metro/Transit Funding Act Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 351
Budget and Taxation
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
4/05/2018 - 2:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0885 /CH0622 Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Condemnation of Land Under Easement Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 622
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0935 Maryland Transportation Authority - Broening Highway/Authority Drive Toll Facility - Bypass Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:36 PM